06.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
29.03.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
28.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.10.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
14.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.06.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
27.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
27.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
27.04.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.10.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2016 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
25.03.2016 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
27.01.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.06.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
31.01.2014 |
First examination report |
|
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
10.06.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.02.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
05.11.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
27.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|