EP2258412 - BIOMEDICAL DEVICES CONTAINING INTERNAL WETTING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Biomedical devices containing internal wetting agents | ||
[2018/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCabe, Kevin P. 10550-205 Baymeadows Road Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | 02 /
Molock, Frank F. 1543 Wildfern Drive Orange Park, FL 32073 / US | 03 /
Hill, Gregory A. 1918 Hickory Lane Atlantic Beach, FL 32233 / US | 04 /
Alli, Azaam 1558 Hope Valley Drive Jacksonville, FL 32221 / US | 05 /
Steffen, Robert B. 75 Bentbrook Circle Webster, NY 14580 / US | 06 /
Vanderlaan, Douglas, G. 1453 N Market Street Jacksonville, FL 32206 / US | 07 /
Young, Kent A. 308 Talwood Trace Jacksonville, FL 32259 / US | [2019/18] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
McCabe, Kevin P. 10550-205 Baymeadows Road Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | ||
02 /
Molock, Frank F. 1543 Wildfern Drive Orange Park, FL 32073 / US | |||
03 /
Hill, Gregory A. 1918 Hickory Lane Atlantic Beach, FL 32233 / US | |||
04 /
Alli, Azaam 1558 Hope Valley Drive Jacksonville, FL 32221 / US | |||
05 /
Steffen, Robert B. 75 Bentbrook Circle Webster, NY 14580 / US | |||
06 /
Vanderlaan, Douglas, G. 1453 N Market Street Jacksonville, FL 32206 / US | |||
07 /
Young, Kent A. 308 Talwood Trace Jacksonville, FL 32259 / US | |||
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
McCabe, Kevin P. 10550-205 Baymeadows Road Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | ||
02 /
Molock, Frank F. 1543 Wildfern Drive Orange Park, FL 32073 / US | |||
03 /
Hill, Gregory A. 1918 Hickory Lane Atlantic Beach, FL 32233 / US | |||
04 /
Alli, Azaam 1558 Hope Valley Drive Jacksonville, FL 32221 / US | |||
05 /
Steffen, Robert B. 1158 Blue Heron Lane West Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250 / US | |||
06 /
Vanderlaan, Douglas, G. 1453 N Market Street Jacksonville, FL 32206 / US | |||
07 /
Young, Kent A. 308 Talwood Trace Jacksonville, FL 32259 / US | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2010/49] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10178626.7 | 09.09.2002 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US20010318536P | 10.09.2001 Original published format: US 318536 P | US20020236538 | 06.09.2002 Original published format: US 236538 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258412 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258412 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/52, A61L27/18, A61L27/26, C08F251/00, C08F265/04, C08F271/00, C08F271/02, C08F291/00, C08F290/06, C08F283/06, C08F283/12, G02B1/04, G02C7/02 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
G02B1/043 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,KR,US);
C08F251/00 (US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F271/00 (US);
C08F271/02 (EP,US);
C08F283/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F290/06 (KR,US);
C08F290/068 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
A61L27/26, C08L83/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/49] | A61L27/26, A61L27/36, A61L27/52, A61L31/04, A61F2/14, G02C7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2019/18] |
Former [2010/49] | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT | Title | German: | INTERNE NETZMITTEL ENTHALTENDE BIOMEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/22] | English: | BIOMEDICAL DEVICES CONTAINING INTERNAL WETTING AGENTS | [2018/29] | French: | Dispositifs biomédicaux contenant des agents mouillants internes | [2018/30] |
Former [2010/49] | Interne Netzmittel enthaltende biomedizinische Vorrichtungen | ||
Former [2010/49] | Biomedical devices containing internal wetting agents | ||
Former [2010/49] | Dispositifs biomédicaux contenant des agents mouillants internes | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2016 | 14.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02757657.8 / EP1425053 | Divisional application(s) | EP16161217.1 / EP3053605 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020757657) is 11.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3966847 (SEIDERMAN MAURICE) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * examples 1,5,8 *; | [Y]US4136250 (MUELLER KARL F, et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * claim - *; | [Y]US4771089 (OFSTEAD RONALD F [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 47 - column 7, line 62 * * examples 1,2,4,10,11 ** claim - *; | [Y]US5358995 (LAI YU-CHIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * examples 4-13 * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0643083 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * claim - *; | [Y]US5486579 (LAI YU-CHIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * claim - *; | [YP]WO0170837 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [YP] 1-11 * page 3, line 3 - line 11 * * page 4, line 5 - line 7 * * page 8, line 18 - line 31 * * page 9, line 26 - page 11, line 22 * * examples 15,17 * * claim - *; | [Y] - KUNZLER J F, "Silicone Hydrogels for Contact Lens Application", TRENDS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960201), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0966-4793, pages 52 - 59, XP004049314 [Y] 1-11 * page 56, column R, line 26 - page 58, column L, line 26 * | Examination | - LORRAINE M. LANDER ET AL, "A systematic comparison of contact angle methods", LANGMUIR, (19930801), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:10.1021/la00032a055, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 2237 - 2239, XP055097497 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la00032a055 | by applicant | US3408429 | US3660545 | US4113224 | US4139513 | US4139692 | US4197266 | US4235985 | US4259467 | US4260725 | US4261875 | US4495313 | US4649184 | US4680336 | US4711943 | US4889664 | US4910277 | US5039459 | US5070215 | US5304584 | US5484863 | US5565539 | US5690953 | US5944853 | US5994488 | US6020445 | US2002016383 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, N-Vinyl Amide Polymers, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC., vol. 17, pages 198 - 257 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, N-Vinyl Amide Polymers, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC, vol. 17, pages 198 - 257 | - PRO. ACS DIV. POLYM. MAT. SCI. ENG., (19970413), page 42 | WO2002JP02231 |