EP2335720 - Autologous T-cell vaccines against multiple sclerosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/25] | Autologous T-cell vaccines materials and methods | ||
[2012/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | 07.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opexa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1709 Dryden Road Suite 911 Houston, TX 77030 / US | For all designated states Baylor College Of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Jingwu 2219 Parkview Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | [2013/14] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Zhang, Jingwu 2219 Parkview Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10178920.4 | 12.09.2002 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20010952532 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: US 952532 | [2011/25] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080004597 | 12.09.2002 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335720 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2335720 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61P37/04, C12N5/0783, A61K35/14, A61K35/24 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4621 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/46432 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/46433 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | A61K39/00, A61K39/38, A61K35/14, A61P37/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Autologe T-Zelle-Impfstoffe gegen multiple Sklerose | [2012/31] | English: | Autologous T-cell vaccines against multiple sclerosis | [2012/31] | French: | Vaccins de lymphocyte T autologue contre la sclérose en plaques | [2012/31] |
Former [2011/25] | Autologe T-Zelle-Impfstoffmaterialien und Verfahren | ||
Former [2011/25] | Autologous T-cell vaccines materials and methods | ||
Former [2011/25] | Matériaux et procédés de vaccins de lymphocyte T autologue | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02778249.9 / EP1416956 | EP08004597.4 / EP1946767 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020778249) is 10.01.2005 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | BG | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9913904 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]); |