EP2277895 - Nucleic acids and proteins from streptococcus groups A & B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | For all designated states J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Telford, John Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
Masignani, Vega Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
Grandi, Guido Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 04 /
Fraser, Claire The Inst. for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 05 /
Tettelin, Herve The Inst. for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 06 /
Scarselli, Maria Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Telford, John Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | ||
02 /
Masignani, Vega Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | |||
03 /
Grandi, Guido Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | |||
04 /
Fraser, Claire The Inst. for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | |||
05 /
Tettelin, Herve The Inst. for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | |||
06 /
Scarselli, Maria Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | Representative(s) | Bullett, Rachel Margaret Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Bullett, Rachel Margaret Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2011/04] | Bullett, Rachel Margaret Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179737.1 | 29.10.2001 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | GB20000026333 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: GB 0026333 | GB20000028727 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0028727 | GB20010005640 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: GB 0105640 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2277895 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277895 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/315 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/315 (EP,US);
A61K39/092 (US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/1275 (US);
C07K16/40 (US);
C12N9/1088 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Nukleinsäure und Proteine von Gruppen A und B Streptokokken | [2011/04] | English: | Nucleic acids and proteins from streptococcus groups A & B | [2011/04] | French: | Acides nucléiques et protéines dérivés des groupes de streptocoques A et B | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01982584.3 / EP1328543 | EP09004551.9 / EP2189473 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010982584) is 23.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | IE | 29.10.2013 | LU | 29.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 29.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 29.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 16.12.2013 | Cited in | by applicant | EP0012873 | EP0036259 | EP0036776 | US4336336 | EP0060057 | EP0063953 | US4405712 | EP0121775 | WO8404541 | EP0127328 | EP0127839 | EP0136829 | EP0136907 | EP0155476 | US4546083 | US4551433 | EP0164556 | EP0176170 | US4588684 | US4603112 | EP0196056 | EP0219237 | JPS6296086 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4689406 | EP0244042 | WO8802406 | US4738921 | US4745056 | EP0267851 | US4762915 | GB2200651 | US4769330 | EP0284044 | US4777127 | US4797368 | WO8901973 | WO8902463 | WO8902468 | WO8904669 | US4837148 | WO8905349 | EP0324647 | EP0324274 | EP0329203 | US4861719 | US4870008 | EP0334301 | WO8909271 | US4876197 | US4880734 | EP0345242 | GB2220221 | WO9002806 | US4929555 | EP0372501 | EP0378881 | WO9007936 | WO9009441 | EP0386882 | WO9011092 | WO9014837 | US4980289 | EP0415731 | WO9102805 | WO9102825 | EP0427347 | EP0440219 | WO9114445 | EP0453242 | EP0471177 | US5091309 | WO9205266 | WO9207945 | WO9210578 | WO9211033 | US5139941 | US5149655 | US5166057 | US5173414 | EP0524968 | WO9303769 | WO9306223 | WO9307283 | WO9307282 | US5206152 | WO9309239 | WO9310218 | US5217879 | WO9311230 | US5219740 | WO9314778 | WO9317712 | WO9319191 | US5252479 | WO9325698 | WO9325234 | WO9403622 | US5288641 | WO9408026 | WO9411506 | WO9412649 | WO9418922 | WO9421792 | US5354678 | WO9424299 | WO9423697 | WO9428152 | WO9428157 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9502697 | WO9504139 | WO9505835 | WO9507994 | WO9509241 | WO9509654 | WO9511984 | WO9514102 | WO9513796 | US5422120 | WO9524297 | WO9525807 | WO9527071 | WO9529993 | WO9530763 | US5474935 | WO9534671 | US5478745 | EP0689454 | WO9602555 | WO9605320 | WO9629412 | EP0735898 | WO9637626 | US5580859 | US5591624 | US5608143 | EP0761231 | US5659122 | US5693506 | WO9804702 | WO9806437 | EP0835318 | WO9816247 | EP0505012 | WO9818810 | US5753235 | WO9820734 | WO9837919 | WO9840100 | WO9852581 | WO9855495 | WO9857659 | WO9858668 | WO9911241 | WO9924578 | WO9927105 | WO9928475 | WO9936544 | WO9944636 | WO9952549 | WO9954457 | WO9957280 | WO0007621 | WO0022430 | WO0023105 | WO0027994 | WO0037494 | WO0056360 | WO0061761 | WO0062800 | WO0121207 | WO0121152 | WO0152885 | EP0509612 | US19940240030 | US19940366787 | US19950405627 | US19950404796 | US19960679640 | US19960023867 | WO2001IB01445 |