EP2289750 - Hybrid vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paice LLC Suite 2310 111 S. Calvert Street Baltimore, MD 21202 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Paice LLC 22957 Shady Knoll Drive Bonita Springs, FL 34135 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Severinsky, Alex J. 4707 Foxhall Crescent Washington, DC 20007 / US | 02 /
Louckes, Theodore 10398 Appomattox Holly, MI 48442 / US | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Severinsky, Alex J. 4707 Foxhall Crescent Washington, DC 20007 / US | ||
02 /
Louckes, Theodore 10398 Appomattox Holly, MI 48442 / US | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/09] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179751.2 | 10.09.1999 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US19980100095P | 14.09.1998 Original published format: US 100095 P | US19990122296P | 01.03.1999 Original published format: US 122296 P | US19990264817 | 09.03.1999 Original published format: US 264817 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289750 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289750 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00, B60L11/08 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
B60K6/442 (EP,US);
B60W20/11 (US);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60L15/2045 (EP);
B60L50/16 (EP);
B60L50/61 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W10/18 (EP);
B60W10/26 (EP);
B60W20/00 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60L2220/12 (EP);
B60L2220/14 (EP);
B60L2220/16 (EP);
B60L2240/423 (EP);
B60L2240/443 (EP);
B60W2510/0633 (EP);
B60W2510/0657 (EP);
B60W2510/244 (EP);
B60W2530/16 (EP);
B60Y2400/435 (EP);
F02D2250/18 (EP);
F02N11/0818 (EP);
F02N2200/061 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/09] | Title | German: | Hybrid Fahrzeug | [2011/09] | English: | Hybrid vehicles | [2011/09] | French: | Véhicule hybride | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 17.11.2011 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 19.12.2011 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04078197.3 / EP1522450 | EP08005284.8 / EP1932704 | EP99969064.7 / EP1113943 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990969064) is 03.07.2003 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | GR | 31.01.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4335429 (KAWAKATSU SHIRO) [Y] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5291960 (BRANDENBURG LARRY R [US], et al) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0839683 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP0916539 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,6 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-6,9 * | by applicant | US1824014 | US2666492 | US3211249 | US3454122 | US3502165 | US3525874 | US3566717 | US3623568 | US3650345 | US3732751 | US3791473 | US3874472 | US3888325 | US3923115 | US3970163 | US4042056 | US4095664 | US4148192 | US4165795 | US4180138 | US4269280 | US4305254 | US4306156 | US4313080 | US4335429 | US4351405 | US4354144 | US4400997 | US4405029 | US4407132 | US4438342 | US4439989 | US4470476 | US4533011 | US4562894 | US4578955 | US4588040 | US4593779 | US4611466 | US4697660 | US4815334 | US4923025 | US4951769 | US5053632 | US5117931 | US5120282 | US5301764 | US5318142 | US5343970 | US5346031 | US5492192 | US5495906 | US5586613 | US5667029 | US5704440 | US5765656 | US5823280 | US5826671 | US5842534 | US5846155 | US5845731 | - SIMANAITIS, "Electric Vehicles", ROAD & TRACK, (199205), pages 126 - 136 | - REYNOLDS, "AC Propulsion CRX", ROAD & TRACK, (199210), pages 126 - 129 | - Rlectric and Hybrid Vehicle Technoloqy, SAE, (199202), vol. SP-915 | - WOUK, HYBRIDS: THEN AND NOW | - BATES, ON THE ROAD WITH A FORD HEV | - KING ET AL., "Transit Bus takes the Hybrid Route", IEEE SPECTRUM, (199507), vol. 32, page 7 | - YAMAGUCHI, "Toyota readies gasoline/electric hybrid system", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, (199707), pages 55 - 58 | - WILSON, "Not Electric, Not Gasoline, But Both", AUTOWEEK, (19970602), pages 17 - 18 | - BULGIN, "The Future Works, Quietly", AUTOWEEK, (19980223), page 12,13 | - NAGASAKA ET AL., "Development of the Hybrid/Battery ECU for the Toyota Hybrid System", SAE PAPER 981122, (1998), pages 19 - 27 | - Automotive Handbook, 2nd Ed.,, ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, (1986), page 356 |