EP2267548 - Developer, developer cartridge and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koido, Kenji c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | 02 /
Ishihara, Toru c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/52] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179913.8 | 23.05.2003 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | JP20020152151 | 27.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002152151 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267548 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267548 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/087, G03G9/09, G03G9/097 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
G03G9/091 (EP,US);
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/08782 (EP,US);
G03G9/0902 (EP,US);
G03G9/0904 (EP,US);
G03G9/0906 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/52] | Title | German: | Entwickler, Entwicklerbehälter und Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2010/52] | English: | Developer, developer cartridge and image forming apparatus | [2010/52] | French: | Développateur, récipient de développateur et appareil de formation d'images | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03253230.1 / EP1367451 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030253230) is 23.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US6455215 (HASHIMOTO MASAKI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-4,6 * column 5, line 24 - line 25 * * column 13, line 30 - column 15, line 51 *; | [X]JPH09179348 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * column 5, line 24 - line 25 * * column 13, line 30 - column 15, line 51 *; | [XY]JP2001154412 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,7; | [X]JPH10312088 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]JP2001350343 (CANON KK) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH0451265 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 7 * abstract * |