EP2258735 - Cationic grafted starch copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemira Oyj Porkkalankatu 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauschel, Bernd Im Plackenbruch 43 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Thiele, Bernd Siegfried-Lenz-Weg 18 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Hübbe, Thomas Hochwinkel 22 51069 Köln / DE | 04 /
Jansen, Bernhard Kekulestr. 19 51061 Köln / DE | [2014/01] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
Hauschel, Bernd Im Planckenbruch 43 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
Thiele, Bernd Siegfried-Lenz-Weg 18 64625 Bensheim / DE | |||
03 /
Hübbe, Thomas Hochwinkel 22 51069 Köln / DE | |||
04 /
Jansen, Bernhard Kekulestr. 19 51061 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Hauschel, Bernd Im Planckenbruch 43 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
Thiele, Bernd Brombeerweg 4 51519 Odenthal / DE | |||
03 /
Hübbe, Thomas Hochwinkel 22 51069 Köln / DE | |||
04 /
Jansen, Bernhard Kekulestr. 19 51061 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Hauschel, Bernd Walter-Flex-Str. 30 51373 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02 /
Thiele, Bernd Brombeerweg 4 51519 Odenthal / DE | |||
03 /
Hübbe, Thomas Hochwinkel 22 51069 Köln / DE | |||
04 /
Jansen, Bernhard Kekulestr. 19 51061 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | Kreller-Schober, Maria Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/23] |
Former [2014/19] | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180072.0 | 14.02.2004 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | DE2003108753 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10308753 | [2010/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258735 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258735 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F251/00, C08L51/02, C09D151/02 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
D21H21/20 (EP,US);
C08F251/00 (EP,US);
D21H17/28 (EP,US);
D21H17/375 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F251/00, C08F220/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Kationische Stärke-Pfropfcopolymere | [2010/49] | English: | Cationic grafted starch copolymers | [2010/49] | French: | Copolymères greffés cationiques d'amidon | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04003355.7 / EP1452552 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040003355) is 16.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2004 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/46] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4028290 (REID ALBERT R) [X] 6-9 * Zusammenfassung ; Spalte 5, Zeile 1-3 "paper" ; Spalte 1, Zeile 57-62 ; Spalte 3, Zeile 31, 37-47 ; Spalte 4, Zeile 48-60 ; Spalte 3, Zeile 29-31 ; Spalte 5, Zeile 12-21 "dehydrated" *; column 5, lines 4-11 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 11 *; | [X]EP0194987 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 6-9 * abstract * * claims 18-21 * * page 1, lines 1-31 * * claims 8-17 * * page 3, lines 1,2 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 36 *; | [Y]EP0147380 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [Y] 6-9 * Ansprüche 1,2 ; Seite 4, Zeile 1-7, 18-33 ; Seite 5, Zeile 1-3, 23-26 *; page 9, lines 3-36 *; | [Y]US5886124 (KIGHTLINGER ADRIAN P [US], et al) [Y] 6-9 * Ansprüche 3,12,13,15 ; Spalte 5, Zeile 31-51 ; Spalte 3, Zeile 19-21 *; | [A]US4330365 (TESSLER MARTIN M) [A] 1-9 * Zusammenfassung ; Anspruch 3 ; Spalte 3, Zeile 46, "C2-C3 alkylene" ; Spalte 3, Zeile 30-38, 50-58 ; Spalte 4, Zeile 23-25 *; | [Y]US4278573 (TESSLER MARTIN M) [Y] 6-9 * Zusammenfassung ; Anspruch 6, "C2-C3 alkylene" ; Spalte 3, Zeile 25-32, 41,45-53 *; column 1, lines 1-17,34-42 * * column 6, lines 11-26 *; | [Y]EP0405917 (SEQUA CHEMICALS INC [US]) [Y] 6-9 * Ansprüche 11, 14 ; Seite 4, Zeile 12-17 *; | [A]US3984361 (GUGLIEMELLI LEWIS A, et al) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 * * column 2, lines 1-4 * * claims 2-12 * * column 3, lines 11-16 *; | [A]EP0281395 (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * Ansprüche 1-12 ; Seite 2, Zeile 50-63, 29-32 *; | [A]US4744864 (DEETS GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * Ansprüche 5,6,8,10,12,13 ; Spalte 3, Zeile 23-31 *; | [A]US4400496 (BUTLER GEORGE B [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * Anspruch 1 * | by applicant | US4400496 | EP0194987 | US4605702 | EP0582166 | EP0944886 |