EP2280418 - MOS-gated device having a buried gate and process for forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intersil Corporation 2401 Palm Bay Road, N.N. Palm Bay Florida 32905 / US | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kocon, Christopher 16 Grace Drive Plains, PA 18705 / US | 02 /
Zeng, Jun 150 Catalpa Avenue Mountaintop, PA 18707 / US | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Lucke, Andreas Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180114.0 | 03.02.2000 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | US19990260411 | 01.03.1999 Original published format: US 260411 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280418 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L29/74, H01L21/336, H01L21/331, H01L21/332 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/4236 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66348 (EP,US);
H01L29/66734 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7397 (EP,US);
H01L29/7813 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [2011/05] | Title | German: | MOS-Anordnung mit einer vergrabenen Gate und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2011/05] | English: | MOS-gated device having a buried gate and process for forming same | [2011/05] | French: | Dispositif MOS à grille enterrée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/05] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00102398.5 / EP1033759 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000102398) is 04.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JPH02144971 (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1,7 * Abs.Fig. and corresponding text * [A] 2-6,8-13; | [A]US5828100 (TAMBA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * Fig.2 and corresponding text * | [T] - B.Jayant Baliga, Power semiconductor devices, USA, PWS Publishing Company, (19951231), XP002606674 [T] * pgs.410, second and third pars., pg.412, third par., pg.414, second and third par. and pg.417 first complete par. * * Section 7.10.1 * * pg. 410, 2nd. par * | [T] - W.Till and J.Luxon, Integrated Circuits: materials, devices and fabrication, USA, Prentice-Hall Inc. N.J. 07632, (19821231), XP002606675 [T] * Fig. 8.3 and corresponding text, pgs. 187-199 * | [T] - DELEONIBUS S, "Is there LOCOS after LOCOS?", SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19970701), vol. 41, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0038-1101(97)00017-8, ISSN 0038-1101, pages 1027 - 1039, XP004075376 [T] * Fig.4 and Section 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0038-1101(97)00017-8 | [IA] - MATSUMOTO S ET AL, "A HIGH-PERFORMANCE SELF-ALIGNED UMOSFET WITH A VERTICAL TRENCH CONTACT STRUCTURE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (199405), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 814 - 818, XP000483880 [I] 1,7 * Fig.2 and corresponding text;; figure 1B * [A] 2-6,8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.285036 | [AD] - BULUCEA C ET AL, "TRENCH DMOS TRANSISTOR TECHNOLOGY FOR HIGH-CURRENT (100 A RANGE) SWITCHING", SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19910501), vol. 34, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0038-1101(91)90153-P, ISSN 0038-1101, pages 493 - 507, XP000201893 [AD] 1-13 * Figs.3 and 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0038-1101(91)90153-P | by applicant | - BULUCEA; ROSSEN, "Trench DMOS Transistor Technology for High-Current (100 A Range) Switching", SOLID-STATE ELECTRONICS, (1991), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 493 - 507 |