EP2277529 - Therapeutical application of SCF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pourquier, Didier 3 bis, rue des Coronilles 34070 Montpellier / FR | For all designated states Moukoko, Didier 64, rue de Courbuisson 77920 Samois sur Seine / FR | [2012/23] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Pourquier, Didier 3 bis, rue des Coronilles 34070 Montpellier / FR | ||
For all designated states Moukoko, M. Didier 64, rue de Courbuisson 77920 Samois sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/23] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2011/04] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10180416.9 | 06.01.2003 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | FR20020000610 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: FR 0200610 | [2011/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2277529 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277529 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/19, A61K38/18, A61P25/00, A61P9/10 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
A61K38/18 (EP);
A61K38/193 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Therapeutische verwendung von SCF | [2011/04] | English: | Therapeutical application of SCF | [2011/04] | French: | Application thérapeutique du SCF | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03712209.0 / EP1465653 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030712209) is 24.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2003 | AT | 06.06.2012 | CY | 06.06.2012 | CZ | 06.06.2012 | DK | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | SE | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | TR | 06.06.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | PT | 08.10.2012 | IE | 06.01.2013 | LU | 06.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 06.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 06.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
SE | 06.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9917798 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 8, line 2 - line 12; claims 1-9 * * page 9, paragraph 4 * [Y] 1-10; | [XPY]DE10033219 (UNIV HEIDELBERG [DE]) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *[Y] 1-10; | [XY] - W.R. SCHÄBITZ ET AL., "Recombinant granulocyte-colony stimulating factor (rG-CSF) is neuroprotective following focal transient cerebral ischemia and excitotoxicity.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS; 31ST ANNUAL MEETING, SAN DIEGO, CA, NOVEMBER 10-15, 2001, (2001), vol. 27, no. part 2, page 2027, XP008009334 [X] 1-10 * abrégé 764.11 * [Y] 1-10 | [YD] - D. ORLIC ET AL., "Mobilized bone marrow cells repair the infarcted heart, improving function and survival.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON, US, (20010828), vol. 98, no. 18, pages 10344 - 10349, XP002216659 [YD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.181177898 | [YD] - É. MEZEY ET AL., "Turning blood into brain: Cells bearing neuronal antigens generated in vivo from bone marrow.", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA, US, (20001201), vol. 290, pages 1779 - 1782, XP002216660 [YD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.290.5497.1779 | [AD] - T. TAKAHASHI ET AL., "Ischemia-and cytokine-induced mobilization of bone marrow-derived endothelial progenitor cells for neovascularization.", NATURE MEDICINE, NEW YORK, N.Y., US, (199904), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 434 - 438, XP002216661 [AD] 1-10 * page 436, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/8462 | by applicant | - GRATWOHL, "Transplantation of G-CSF mobilized allogeneic peripheral blood stem cells in rabbits", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANT, (1995), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 63 - 68 | - NOHYNEK GJ, "Comparison of potency of glycosylated and non glycosylated recombinant human granulocyte colony-stimulating factors in neutropenic and non neutropenic CD rats", CANCER CHEMOTHER PHARMACø1, (1997), vol. 39, pages 259 - 266 | - KRONENWETT R, "The role of cytokines and adhesion molecules for mobilisation of peripheral blood stem cells", STEM CELLS, (2000), vol. 18, pages 320 - 330 | - PLESS M, "Synergy of growth factors during mobilization of peripheral blood precursors cells with recombinant Flt3-ligand and granulocyte colony-stimulating factor in rabbits", EXP HEMATOL, (1999), vol. 27, pages 155 - 161 | - KIKUTA T, "Mobilization of hematopoietic primitive and commited progenitor cells into blood in mice by antivascular adhesion molecule-1 antibody alone or in combination with granulocyte colony-stimulating factor", EXP HEMATOL., (2000), vol. 28, pages 311 - 317 | - SWEENEY EA, "Increase in circulating SDF-1 after treatment with sulfated glycans. The role of SDF-1 in mobilization", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (2001), vol. 938, pages 48 - 52 | - PAPAYANNOPOULOU R, "Synergistic mobilization of hematopoietic progenitor cells using concurrent beta-1 and beta-2 integrin blockade or beta2- deficient mice", BLOOD, (2001), vol. 97, pages 1282 - 1288 | - CHRIST O., "Combining G-CSF with a blockade of adhesion strongly improves the reconstitutive capacity of mobilized hematopoietic progenitor cells", EXP HEMATOL, (2001), vol. 29, pages 380 - 390 | - LEVESQUE JP, "Vascular cell adhesion molecule-1(CD106) is cleaved by neutrophil proteases in the bone marrow following hematopoietic progenitor cell mobilization by granulocyte colonystimulating factor", BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, pages 1289 - 1297 | - PITTENGER, "Multilineage potentiel of human mesenchymal stem cells", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 143 - 147 | - DENNIS, "A quadripotential mesenchymal progenitor cell isolated from the marrow of an adult mouse", J BONE MINER RES, (1999), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 700 - 709 | - SESHI, "Human bone marrow stromal cell: coexpression of markers specific for multiple mesenchymal stem lineage", BLOOD CELL MOL DIS, (2000), pages 234 - 246 | - WOODBURY D, "Adult rat and human bone marrow stromal cells differentiate into neurons", J NEUROSCI RES, (2000), vol. 61, pages 364 - 370 | - SANCHEZRAMOS J, "Adult bone marrow stromal celle differentiate into neural celle in vitro", EXP NEUROL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 247 - 256 | - MEZEY E, "Turning blood into brain: cells bearing neuronal antigens generated in vivo from bone marrow", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 1672 - 1674 | - AZIZI SA, "Engraftment and migration of human bone marrow stromal cells implanted in brains of albino rats - similarities to astrocytes graft", PROC NAT ACAD SCI., (1998), vol. 95, pages 3908 - 3913 | - KOPEN GC, "Marrow stromal cells migrate throughout forebrain and cerebellum, and they differentiate into astrocytes after injection into neonatal mouse brains", PROC NAT ACAD SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 10171 - 10716 | - BRAZELTON TR, "From marrow to brain: expression of neuronal phenotypes in adult mice", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 1775 - 1779 | - SHI Q, "Evidence for circulating bone marrow-derived endothelial cells", BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, pages 362 - 367 | - ASAHARA T, "Bone marrow origin of endothelial progenitor cells responsible for post natal vasculogenesis in physiological and pathological neovascularization", CIRC RES, (1999), vol. 85, pages 221 - 228 | - LAGASSE E, "Purified hematopoietic stem cells can differentiate into hepatocytes in vivo", NATURE MEDECINE, (2000), vol. 6, pages 1229 - 1234 | - KRAUSE D, "Multi-organ, multi-lineage engraftment by a single bone marrow-derived stem cell", CELL, (2001), vol. 105, pages 369 - 377 | - BJORNSON CRR, "Turning brain into blood:a hematopoietic fate adopted by adult neural stem cells in vivo", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 283, pages 534 - 537 | - RIETZE RL, "Purification of a pluripotent neural stem cell from the adult mouse brain", NATURE, (2001), vol. 412, pages 736 - 739 | - JACKSON KJ, "Hematopoietic potential of stem cells isolated from murine skeletal muscle", PROC NATI ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 14482 - 14486 | - FU X, "Dedifferentiation of epidermal cells to stem cells in vivo", LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, pages 1067 - 1068 | - TOMA JG, "Isolation of multipotent adult stem cells from the dermis of mammalian skin", NAT CELL BIOT, (2001), vol. 3, pages 778 - 784 | - BRUDER, "Bone regeneration by implantation of purified culture- expended human mesenchymal stem cells", J ORTHO RES, (1998), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 155 - 162 | - AWAD HA, "Autologous mesenchymal stem cell-mediated repair of tendon", TISSUE ENG, (1999), vol. 5, pages 267 - 277 | - BUTLER DL, "Perspectives on cell and collagen composites for tendon repair", CLIN ORTHOP, (1999), vol. 367, pages 324 - 332 | - JACKSON KA, "Regeneration of ischemic cardiac muscle and vascular endothelium by aduit stem cells", J CLIN INVEST, (2001), vol. 107, pages 1395 - 1402 | - ORLIC D, "Bone marrow cells regenerate infarcted myocardium", NATURE, (2001), vol. 410, pages 702 - 705 | - SCHWARZ EJ, "Multipotential marrow stroma cells transducted fo produce L-DOPA: engraftment in rat .model of Parkinson disease", HUM GENE THER, (1999), vol. 10, pages 2539 - 2545 | - DING L, "Bone marrow stromal cells as a vehicle for gene transfer", GENE THER, (1999), vol. 6, pages 1611 - 1616 | - PURTON LE, "Monocytes are the likely candidate "stromal" cell in G-CSF-mobilized peripheral blood", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANT., (1998), vol. 21, pages 1075 - 1076 | - HUSS R, "Evidence of peripheral blood-derived, plastic-adherent CD34(-/low) hematopoietic stem cell clones with mesenchyrnal stem cell characteristics", STEM CELL, (2000), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 252 - 260 | - ZVAIFLER NJ, "Mesenchymal precursor cells in blood of normal individuals", ARTHRITIS RES, (2000), vol. 2, pages 477 - 488 | - LANGE, "Hematopoietic reconstruction of syngenic mice with a peripheral blood-derived, monoclonal CD34-, Sca-l+, Thyl(low), c-kit+ stem cell ligne", J HEMATOTHER STEM CELL RES, (1999), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 335 - 342 | - KUZNETSOV SA, "Circulating skelatal stem cells", J CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 153, pages 1133 - 1140 | - RAFII S, "Circulating endothelial precursors:mystery, reality and promise", J CLIN INVEST, (2000), vol. 105, pages 17 - 19 | - BOYER M, "Isolation of endothelial cells and their progenitor cells from human peripheral blood", J VASE SURG, (2000), vol. 31, pages 181 - 189 | - TAKAHASHI T, "Ischemia-and cytokine-induced mobilization of bone marrow-derived endothelial progenitor cells for neovascularization", NATURE MEDECINE, (1999), vol. 5, pages 434 - 438 | - GILL M, "Vascular trauma induces rapid but transient mobilization of VEGFR2(+)AC133(+) endothelial precursor cells", CIR RES, (2001), vol. 88, pages 167 - 174 | - ASAHARA T, "VEGF contributes to postnatal neovascularisation by mobilizing bone marrow-derived endothelial progenitor cells", EMBO J, (1999), vol. 18, pages 1364 - 1372 | - MOORE MA, "Mobilization of endothelial and hematopoietic stem and progenitor cells by adenovector-mediated elevation of serum levels of SDF1,VEGF, and angiopoietin-1", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (2001), vol. 938, page 3645 | - BODINE DM, "Efficient retrovirus transduction of mouse pluripotent hematopoietic stem cell mobilized into the peripheral blood by treatment by granulocyte colony-stimulating factor and stem cell factor", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, pages 1482 - 1491 | - ABE R, "Peripheral blood fibrocytes: Differenciation patways and migration to wound sites", THE J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, pages 7556 - 7562 | - BUCALA R, "Circulating fibrocytes define a new leukocyte subpopulation that mediates tissue repair", MOL MED., (1994), vol. 1, pages 71 - 81 | - CHESNEY J, "Peripheral blood fibrocytes:mesenchymal precursor cells and the pathogenesis of fibrosis", CURR RHEUMATOL REP., vol. 200, no. 2, pages 501 - 505 | - LABAT ML, "Monocytic origin of fibroblasts:spontaneous transformation of blood monocytes into neofibroblastic structures in osteomyeloslerosis and Engelmann's disease", BIOMED PHARMACOTHER., (1991), vol. 45, pages 289 - 299 | - LABAT ML, "Possible monocytic origin of chondrosarcoma: in vitro transdifferenciation of blood monocytes-like cells from a patient with chondrosarcoma into chondrocyte-like cell", BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (1997), vol. 51, pages 79 - 93 | - LABAT M L, "Regulation by phagic T-lymphocytes of a (pluripotent?) organ stem cell present in adult human blood. A beneficial exception to self-tolerance", BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (2001), vol. 55, pages 79 - 90 | - BELTRAMI AP, "Evidence that human cardiac myocytes divide after myocardial infarction", NEW ENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 344, pages 1750 - 1757 | - KONDO T, "Oligodendrocytes precursor cells reprogrammed to become multipotential CNS stem cells", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 289, pages 1754 - 1757 | - JACKSON KA, "Regeneration of ischemic cardiac muscle and vascular endothelium by adult stem cells", J CLIN INVEST, (2001), vol. 107, pages 1395 - 1402 | - KOCHER AA, "Neovascularisation of ischemic myocardium by human bone-marrow-derived angioblast prevents cardiomyocyte apoptosis, reduces remodeling and improves carcdiac function", NATURE MEDECINE, (2001), vol. 7, pages 430 - 436 | - EGLITIS MA, "Targeting of bone marrow-derived astrocytes to the ischemic brain", NEUROREPORT, (1999), vol. 10, pages 1289 - 1292 | - LU D, "Intraarterial. administration of marrow stromal cells in a rat model of traumatic brain injury", J NEUROTRAUMA, (2001), vol. 18, pages 813 - 819 | - CHEN J, "Therapeutic benefit of intracerebral transplantation of bone marrow stromal cells after cerbral ischemia in rats", J NEUROL SCI., (2001), vol. 189, pages 49 - 57 | - MAHMOOD A, "Intracranial bone marrow transplantation after traumatic brain injury improving functional outcome in adult rats", J NEUROSURG, (2001), vol. 94, pages 589 - 595 | - ORLIC D, "Mobilized bone marrow cells repair the infarcted heart, improving function and survival", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 10344 - 10349 |