EP2284994 - A linear transconductance cell with wide tuning range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sahota, Gurkanwai Kamal 3560 Curfew Street San Diego, CA 92103 / US | 02 /
Gudem, Prasad 7180 Shoreline Drive, 5313 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10180434.2 | 16.09.2005 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20040944145 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: US 944145 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284994 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
H03F3/45085 (EP,US);
H03F1/3211 (EP,US);
H03F3/45179 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45352 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45384 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Lineare Transkonduktanzzelle mit breitem Abstimmbereich | [2011/07] | English: | A linear transconductance cell with wide tuning range | [2011/07] | French: | Cellule de transconductance linéaire dotée d'une plage de réglage étendue | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/12] | 22.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05796291.2 / EP1790074 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050796291) is 01.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11168334 ; | [A]WO9613896 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 10; figure 8 *; | [A]US2002050861 (NGUYEN THINH CAT [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0856] - paragraph [0857]; figure 80f *; | [AP]US2004178850 (BANBA SEIICHI [JP]) [AP] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11168334 A 19990622 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |