EP2338506 - COMBINATIONS OF TUMOR-ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS FOR THE TREATMENT OF VARIOUS TYPES OF CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/26] | Combinations of tumor-associated antigens for the treatment of various types of cancers | ||
[2011/41] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MannKind Corporation 25134 Rye Canyon Loop, Suite 300 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Mannkind Corporation 28903 North Avenue Paine Valencia California 91355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiang, Chih-Sheng 10339 Oakdale Avenue Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US | 02 /
Bot, Adrian 24406 West Gable Ranch Lane Valencia, CA 91354 / US | 03 /
Simard, John J.L. 1340 Patterson Road Austin, TX 78733 / US | 04 /
Diamond, David, C. 23135 Schoenborn Street West Hills, CA 91304 / US | [2011/27] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Chiang, Chih-Sheng 10339 Oakdale Avenue Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US | ||
02 /
Bot, Adrian 24406 West Gable Ranch Lane Valencia, CA 91354 / US | |||
03 /
Simard, John J.L. Suite 7, 1684 Alberni Street Vancouver British Columbia Z6G1A6 / CA | |||
04 /
Diamond, David, C. 23135 Schoenborn Street West Hills, CA 91304 / US | Representative(s) | Lasar, Andrea Gisela Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Lasar, Andrea Gisela Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180553.9 | 17.06.2004 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | US20030479554P | 17.06.2003 Original published format: US 479554 P | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2338506 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2338506 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K39/00, A61K31/7088, A61K48/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K39/001104 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON TUMOR-ASSOZIERTEN ANTIGENEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN KREBSTYPEN | [2011/41] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF TUMOR-ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS FOR THE TREATMENT OF VARIOUS TYPES OF CANCERS | [2011/41] | French: | Combinaisons d'antigènes associés aux tumeurs pour le traitement thérapeutique de différents types de cancer | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/26] | Kombinationen von Tumor-assozierten Antigenen zur Behandlung von verschiedenen Krebstypen | ||
Former [2011/26] | Combinations of tumor-associated antigens for the treatment of various types of cancers | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/44] | 22.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2015 | 06.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04755620.4 / EP1633387 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040755620) is 21.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0018933 (AMERICAN FOUNDATION FOR BIOLOG [US], et al); |