EP2292174 - Illumination source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synergetics, Inc. 3845 Corporate Centre Drive O'Fallon, MO 63368 / US | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auld, Michael D. 19 Olden Drive Flemingtom NJ 08822 / US | 02 /
Easley, James C. 3845 Corporate Center Drive O'Fallon, MO 63368 / US | 03 /
Kane, Jonathan S. 120 Derry Road Hudson, NH 03051 / US | 04 /
Scheller, Gregg 17820 Suzanne Ridge Drive Wildwood, MO 63038 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Auld, Michael D. 19 Olden Drive Flemingtom NJ 08822 / US | ||
02 /
Easley, James C. 3845 Corporate Center Drive O'Fallon, MO 63368 / US | |||
03 /
Kane, Jonathan S. 120 Derry Road Hudson, NH 03051 / US | |||
04 /
Scheller, Gregg 17820 Suzanne Ridge Drive Wildwood, MO 63038 / US | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Auld, Michael D. 16201 Pepper View Court Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US | ||
02 /
Easley, James C. 3845 Corporate Center Drive O'Fallon, MO 63368 / US | |||
03 /
Kane, Jonathan S. 120 Derry Road Hudson, NH 03051 / US | |||
04 /
Scheller, Gregg 17820 Suzanne Ridge Drive Wildwood, MO 63038 / US | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2011/10] | Application number, filing date | 10180579.4 | 27.07.2004 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20030490399P | 28.07.2003 Original published format: US 490399 P | US20040550979P | 05.03.2004 Original published format: US 550979 P | US20040577740P | 05.06.2004 Original published format: US 577740 P | US20040577618P | 05.06.2004 Original published format: US 577618 P | US20040900939 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: US 900939 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292174 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292174 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/22, A61F9/008, A61B1/07, G02B6/38, // A61B19/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (EP,US);
A61B1/0669 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (EP,US);
A61F9/008 (EP,US);
G02B6/3894 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2025 (EP,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00863 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00874 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | A61B18/22, A61F9/008 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsquelle | [2011/10] | English: | Illumination source | [2011/10] | French: | Source d'illumination | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 23.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04786120.8 / EP1653896 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040786120) is 12.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2004 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | IE | 27.07.2013 | LU | 27.07.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 27.07.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 27.07.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 27.07.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
SI | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9534011 (SYNTEC INC [US]); | [A]US6367958 (JONES ERIC M [US]) | by applicant | US4757426 | US5323766 |