Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
17.08.2012 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
03.08.2012 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
03.08.2012 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
14.03.2012 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.01.2012 | Change - German title | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
28.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.02.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.12.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
29.11.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |