EP2484766 - Method for producing a target protein connected with a heterogeneous ferritin protein using yeast host cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artes Biotechnology GmbH Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 9 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2013/27] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Artes Biotechnologie GmbH Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 9 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suckow, Manfred, Dr. Urdenbacher Dorfstr. 39 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Eilert, Eva Aachener Str. 101 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Piontek, Michael, Dr. Herder Str. 39 42549 Velbert / DE | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Zenz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Straße 2 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180732.9 | 28.09.2010 | [2012/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484766 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484766 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/81, C12R1/645, C12N1/16 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/81 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP);
C07K2319/01 (EP);
C07K2319/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Ziel-Proteins im Verbund mit einem heterologen Ferritin-Protein unter Verwendung von Hefe-Wirtszellen | [2012/32] | English: | Method for producing a target protein connected with a heterogeneous ferritin protein using yeast host cells | [2012/32] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une protéine cible en relation avec une protéine de ferritine hétérologue en utilisant des cellules-hôtes de levure | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.03.2011 | Appeal received No. J0007/11 | 11.03.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.01.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2010 | AL | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | IT | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MK | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | SM | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | IE | 28.09.2013 | LU | 28.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
LU | 28.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0240695 (RNA INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-18; | [A]KR20020075068 (KIM JUNG BAE [KR]) [A] 1-18; | [A] - FABER K N ET AL, "Foreign gene expression in Hansenula polymorpha. A system for the synthesis of small functional peptides", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 45, no. 1-2, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 72 - 79, XP009160678 [A] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530050651 | [A] - LEE JUNG-LIM ET AL, "Functional assembly of recombinant human ferritin subunits in Pichia pastoris", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200710), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 1695 - 1699 URL, XP002678808 [A] 1-18 | [A] - SEO H -Y ET AL, "Enhanced expression and functional characterization of the human ferritin H- and L-chain genes in Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200311), vol. 63, no. 1, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 57 - 63, XP002678809 [A] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00253-003-1350-3 | [A] - VAD R ET AL, "Engineering of a Pichia pastoris expression system for secretion of high amounts of intact human parathyroid hormone", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 116, no. 3, ISSN 0168-1656, (20050330), pages 251 - 260, (20050330), XP027663548 [A] 1-18 | [T] - EILERT EVA ET AL, "The use of highly expressed FTH1 as carrier protein for cytosolic targeting in Hansenula polymorpha", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201206), vol. 159, no. 3, pages 172 - 176 URL, XP002678810 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2011.12.014 | by applicant | - P. SANTAMBROGIO; S. LEVI; A. COZZI; E. ROVIDAJ; A. ALBERTINI; P. AROS, "Production and Characterization of Recombinant Heteropolymers of Human Ferritin H and L Chains", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 12744 - 12783 | - Y. M. SHIN; T. H. KWON; K. S. KIM; K. S. CHAE; D. H. KIM; M.S. YANG, "Enhanced Iron Uptake of Saccharomyces cerevisiae by Heterologous Expression of a Tadpole Ferritin Gene", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 1280 - 1283 | - J. L. LEE; H. S. SONG; H. J. KIM; J. H. PARK; D. K. CHUNG; C. S. PARK; D. JEUNG; H. Y. KIM, "Functional expression and production of human H-ferritin in Pichia pastoris", BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (2003), vol. 25, pages 1019 - 1023 | - MEYER A. F. ET AL., "An expression system matures: a highly efficient and cost effective process for phytase production by recombinant strains of Hansenula polymorpha", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1999), vol. 63, pages 373 - 381 | - KIM ET AL., "Expression of Heter opolymeric Ferritin Improves Iron Storage in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 69, pages 1999 - 2005 |