EP2325317 - Receptor nucleic acids and polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 250 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2015/24] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ambrose, Christine M. 197 Wakefield St. Reading, MA 01867 / US | 02 /
Thompson, Jeffrey 60 Newcomb Road Stoneham, MA 02180 / US | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2012/45] | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180786.5 | 06.09.2001 | [2011/21] | Priority number, date | US20000233152P | 18.09.2000 Original published format: US 233152 P | US20000243140P | 21.09.2000 Original published format: US 243140 P | US20010268499P | 13.02.2001 Original published format: US 268499 P | US20010312185P | 14.08.2001 Original published format: US 312185 P | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2325317 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2325317 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2325317 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N15/10, C12N5/10, C12P21/02, C07K14/715, C07K16/28, C07H21/04, C12Q1/68, A61K38/17, A61K48/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/68 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/70578 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/1138 (NO);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K48/00 (EP,NO,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07H21/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/715 (NO);
C07K14/7151 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (NO);
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (NO);
G01N33/53 (NO);
G01N33/68 (CN,NO);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2011/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rezeptor-Nukleinsäuren und -Polypeptide | [2011/21] | English: | Receptor nucleic acids and polypeptides | [2011/21] | French: | Récepteur d'acides nucléiques et polypeptides | [2011/21] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Observations by third parties | 22.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 25.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01968621.1 / EP1352063 | EP07105107.2 / EP1842918 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010968621) is 23.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George William Schlich LLP 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George William, et al, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George Schlich LLP 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich LLP 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | 17.09.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.11.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.11.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.06.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2012 | BE | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | IT | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | [2019/07] |
Former [2017/12] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0043032 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0125023 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4736866 | EP0264166 | WO8809810 | US4816567 | US4870009 | US4873316 | US4873191 | WO8910134 | US4946778 | WO9011354 | US4987071 | WO9101140 | US5116742 | WO9209689 | WO9304169 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5272057 | US5283317 | WO9410300 | US5328470 | WO9416101 | US5459039 | US5493531 | US5541087 | US5703055 | US5726044 | WO1986US02269 |