19.08.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.05.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2019 |
First examination report |
|
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] |
29.09.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.09.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
28.09.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
02.03.2018 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
15.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|