Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005053928 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2005 | A3 | WO2005053928 | 16.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004096514 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2005 | A3 | WO2004096514 | 11.11.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0168375 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2002 | A3 | WO0168375 | 20.09.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019322031 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715684948 | 24.08.2017 | US201113044804 | 10.03.2011 | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US201514595240 | 13.01.2015 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201916435594 | 10.06.2019 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US90551507 | 02.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9662836 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2017 | B2 | US2015224709 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US201414165653 | 28.01.2014 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201113159444 | 14.06.2011 | US201514696858 | 27.04.2015 | US98080707 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9334402 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2016 | B2 | US2015129798 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US201313917111 | 13.06.2013 | US201213361357 | 30.01.2012 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US201414538492 | 11.11.2014 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US51829506 | 11.09.2006 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US96357710 | 08.12.2010 | US34221008 | 23.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9744720 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | B2 | US2015123298 | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113044804 | 10.03.2011 | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US201514595240 | 13.01.2015 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US90551507 | 02.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9017589 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2015 | B2 | US2014175706 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US201414165653 | 28.01.2014 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201113159444 | 14.06.2011 | US98080207 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8883392 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2013273376 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US201313917111 | 13.06.2013 | US201213361357 | 30.01.2012 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US51829506 | 11.09.2006 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US96357710 | 08.12.2010 | US34221008 | 23.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8481241 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2013 | B2 | US2012178845 | 12.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US201213361357 | 30.01.2012 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US51829506 | 11.09.2006 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US96357710 | 08.12.2010 | US34221008 | 23.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8636494 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B2 | US2011241240 | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201113159444 | 14.06.2011 | US98080207 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8932511 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2015 | B2 | US2011180952 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113044804 | 10.03.2011 | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US90551507 | 02.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8106107 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2012 | B2 | US2011077321 | 31.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US51829506 | 11.09.2006 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US96357710 | 08.12.2010 | US34221008 | 23.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7851122 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2010 | B2 | US2009105363 | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US51829506 | 11.09.2006 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US34221008 | 23.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008269939 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34403802 | 03.01.2002 | US10287208 | 15.04.2008 | US43351306 | 15.05.2006 | US73044307 | 02.04.2007 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US33603203 | 03.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008166480 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98074207 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7604768 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2009 | B2 | US2008124475 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98080307 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008124464 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98080407 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7628857 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2009 | B2 | US2008121172 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98080507 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7658976 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2010 | B2 | US2008121130 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98080707 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008118655 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98080607 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7958841 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2011 | B2 | US2008110395 | 15.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US98080207 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008105818 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US90551507 | 02.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7369915 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2008 | B2 | US2007173967 | 26.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34403802 | 03.01.2002 | US43351306 | 15.05.2006 | US73044307 | 02.04.2007 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US33603203 | 03.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7479510 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2009 | B2 | US2007168815 | 19.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US51829506 | 11.09.2006 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7209797 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2007 | B2 | US2006206227 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34403802 | 03.01.2002 | US43351306 | 15.05.2006 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US33603203 | 03.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006054039 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7183335 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2007 | B2 | US2005192372 | 01.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US9869005 | 05.04.2005 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7300619 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2007 | B2 | US2004187714 | 30.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003207959 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003151167 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34403802 | 03.01.2002 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US33603203 | 03.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11485056 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2022 | B2 | US2021206031 | 08.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US201816155211 | 09.10.2018 | US201414165653 | 28.01.2014 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201113159444 | 14.06.2011 | US98080207 | 31.10.2007 | US201514696858 | 27.04.2015 | US202117194337 | 08.03.2021 | US201715607499 | 28.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10940616 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B2 | US2019047185 | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US201816155211 | 09.10.2018 | US201414165653 | 28.01.2014 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201113159444 | 14.06.2011 | US98080207 | 31.10.2007 | US201514696858 | 27.04.2015 | US201715607499 | 28.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10335994 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2017368738 | 28.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113044804 | 10.03.2011 | US42473203 | 29.04.2003 | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US201514595240 | 13.01.2015 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | US90551507 | 02.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10099406 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2018 | B2 | US2017259469 | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US53745805 | 03.06.2005 | US201414165653 | 28.01.2014 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | US201113159444 | 14.06.2011 | US201514696858 | 27.04.2015 | US201715607499 | 28.05.2017 | US98080707 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3480001 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2022 | B1 | EP3480001 | 08.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | EP03777142 | 03.12.2003 | EP05108803 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | EP10180833 | 03.12.2003 | EP10151775 | 03.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2463082 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11192006 | 28.11.2004 | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | EP04819735 | 28.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2431157 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | EP04819735 | 28.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2298540 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B1 | EP2298540 | 18.07.2012 | A3 | EP2298540 | 23.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | EP01912099 | 13.03.2001 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | EP06121497 | 13.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2277686 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B1 | EP2277686 | 18.07.2012 | A3 | EP2277686 | 26.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | EP01912099 | 13.03.2001 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | EP06121497 | 13.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2199068 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B1 | EP2199068 | 22.02.2012 | A3 | EP2199068 | 23.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03777142 | 03.12.2003 | EP05108803 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1741545 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2013 | B1 | EP1741545 | 29.09.2010 | A3 | EP1741545 | 10.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | EP01912099 | 13.03.2001 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1695144 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2009 | A4 | EP1695144 | 30.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | WO2004IL01089 | 28.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1637307 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2006 | A3 | EP1637307 | 22.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03777142 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1590149 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2008 | B1 | EP1590149 | 22.02.2006 | A4 | EP1590149 | 02.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1274551 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2006 | B1 | EP1274551 | 11.06.2003 | A4 | EP1274551 | 15.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | IL0100241 | 13.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4101501 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | IL0100241 | 13.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003286397 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2295227 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | A3 | EP2295227 | 16.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03777142 | 03.12.2003 | EP05108803 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | EP10151775 | 03.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE341440T | 15.10.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101898423B | 07.05.2014 | B | CN101898423 | 01.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104275798 | 14.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1926470B | 16.06.2010 | B | CN1926470 | 07.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | WO2004IL01089 | 28.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60123595T | 16.08.2007 | T2 | DE60123595D1 | 16.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | IL0100241 | 13.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60324332D1 | 04.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1741545T | 04.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | EP01912099 | 13.03.2001 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2277686T | 04.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | EP06121497 | 13.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2431319T | 26.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2432645T | 04.12.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1089128 | 24.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0301024 | 03.12.2003 | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1153431 | 30.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1155695 | 25.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1205981 | 31.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72599503 | 03.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6569373 | 27.05.2003 | B2 | US2002008333 | 24.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | US80310801 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002016386 | 07.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18869800 | 13.03.2000 | US79786901 | 05.03.2001 | US19532100 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004050323 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE411888T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1145477 | 21.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43036202 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP3480001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1590149 | EP1637307 | EP2199068 |