EP2295227 - Apparatus and method for printing of three-dimensional objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratasys Ltd. 2 Holzman Street 3rd Floor Kiryat Weizmann Science Park 76124 Rehovot / IL | [2013/12] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Objet Geometries Ltd. 2 Holtzman Street, Kiryat Weizmann, Science Park Building 16 Rehovot 76124 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kritchman, Eliahu 56 Mota Gur Street 69012, Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
Gothait, Hanan 31 Hashomrim Street 76230, Rehovot / IL | 03 /
Napadensky, Eduardo 86 Yehuda Halevi Street 42325, Netanya / IL | 04 /
Chechik, Dani 1/4 Afriat Street 72282, Ramle / IL | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP, et al The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Vaughan, Christopher Tammo, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Harrison Goddard Foote Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds, Yorkshire LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10180833.5 | 03.12.2003 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20020430362P | 03.12.2002 Original published format: US 430362 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2295227 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2295227 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/245, B29C64/112, B33Y40/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y30/00 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B29C41/02 (EP,US);
B29C41/48 (EP,US);
B29C41/52 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
B29C64/112 (EP,US);
B29C64/245 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/10 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92209 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,US);
B29C37/005 (EP,US);
B29C64/118 (EP,US);
B29C64/124 (EP,US);
B29C64/129 (EP,US);
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
B29C64/40 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2011/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Drucken von drei-dimensionalen Gegenständen | [2011/11] | English: | Apparatus and method for printing of three-dimensional objects | [2011/11] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la création d'objets tridimensionels par impression | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03777142.5 / EP1590149 | EP05108803.7 / EP1637307 | EP10151775.3 / EP2199068 | Divisional application(s) | EP18202709.4 / EP3480001 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030777142) is 19.09.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0426363 (STRATASYS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,12* column 12, line 43 - column 13, line 12 *; | [XA]US5506607 (SANDERS JR ROYDEN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * column 13, paragraph "Model Mounting" * [A] 3-7 | by applicant | US6259962 | US6569373 | US19990412618 | US20000484272 | US20010803108 | US20020108902 | US20030336032 | US20030424732 | WO2003IL00746 |