Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100572252B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2006 | B1 | KR20020091160 | 05.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0102809 | 30.03.2001 | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3836725B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2006 | B2 | JPWO2001073220 | 08.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0102809 | 30.03.2001 | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4176762B | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | B2 | JP2006183452 | 13.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005334178 | 18.11.2005 | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1273721 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2013 | B1 | EP1273721 | 29.07.2009 | A4 | EP1273721 | 08.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0102809 | 30.03.2001 | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2261426 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2012 | B1 | EP2261426 | 15.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01917741 | 30.03.2001 | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7010403 | 07.03.2006 | B2 | US2003093203 | 15.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0102809 | 30.03.2001 | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0173220 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100639812B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2006 | B1 | KR20060018929 | 02.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1227420C | 16.11.2005 | C | CN1422353 | 04.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000099086 | 31.03.2000 | Type | Earlier application | EP1273721 |