EP2301418 - Medical apparatus and endoscope apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuyoshi, Akira c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kagaya, Hiroto c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Torii, Yuichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Iida, Takayuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180908.5 | 28.09.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | JP20090225406 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009225406 | JP20090296218 | 25.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009296218 | JP20100148390 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010148390 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301418 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, A61B1/07, A61B5/00 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A61B1/063 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/0607 (EP,US);
A61B1/0638 (EP,US);
A61B1/0653 (EP,US);
A61B1/0669 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung und Endoskopvorrichtung | [2011/13] | English: | Medical apparatus and endoscope apparatus | [2011/13] | French: | Appareil médical et appareil d'endoscope | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004147809 (KAZAKEVICH YURI [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I]JP2007139822 (OLYMPUS CORP) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * automatic translation used * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0013] - [0014] - [0032] - [0038] * * figure 9 *; | [I]US2008090198 (LIANG RONGGUANG [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0029] , [0113] * * figure 12C * * paragraph [0084] *; | EP2020202 [ ] (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2009034224 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [AD] 1-14 * abstract * | Examination | US2001007051 | JP2005304816 | US2008208006 | by applicant | JP2009034224 |