Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2301418
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.12.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
07.11.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.09.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.04.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2011 |
First examination report |
|
15.11.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.09.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |