EP2374620 - Liquid jetting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaug, Junhua c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180944.0 | 29.09.2000 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | JP19990280811 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 28081199 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374620 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
B41J2/04551 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04593 (EP,US);
B41J2/04595 (EP,US);
B41J2/04596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/41] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsausstoßvorrichtung | [2011/41] | English: | Liquid jetting apparatus | [2011/41] | French: | Appareil d'éjection de liquide | [2012/28] |
Former [2011/41] | Appareil d'injection liquide | Examination procedure | 11.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00121222.4 / EP1088662 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0827838 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2 * figures 9,11,13,19 *; | [A]EP0885732 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figure 12 * * page 8, line 11 - line 32 *; | [A]EP0893260 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 8 * * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 6 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0913256 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 18A ** paragraphs [0098] , [0099] *; | [E]EP1106360 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2 * paragraphs [0096] - [0099] * * figures 5,9A-B * |