EP2258299 - Apparatus for thermal treatment of tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blewett, Jeffrey J. 86 Parkview Drive Plantsville, CT 06479 / US | 02 /
Maurer, Christopher W. 2 White Oak Farm Road Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 03 /
Stone, Corbett, W. 9236 Ronda Avenue San Diego, CA 92123 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181038.0 | 31.07.1997 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US19960699091 | 16.08.1996 Original published format: US 699091 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2258299 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2258299 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B18/1485 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22077 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2010/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung von Gewebe | [2010/49] | English: | Apparatus for thermal treatment of tissue | [2010/49] | French: | Appareil de traitement thermique des tissus | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 19.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09154719.0 / EP2062546 | EP97936333.0 / EP0930847 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970936333) is 09.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9613218 (DESAI ASHVIN H [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10 * figure 21 * [I] 4-6,9,11; | [A]US5370675 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A]WO9519142 (VIDAMED INC [US]) [A] 4-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5472441 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9622739 (VIDAMED INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * figure 2 * |