EP2282310 - Entropy coding by adapting coding between level and run-length/level modes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, RO | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehrohtra, Sanjeev c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
Chen, Wei-ge c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2012/04] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Mehrohtra, Sanjeev c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Wei-ge c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181047.1 | 03.09.2003 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US20020408538P | 04.09.2002 Original published format: US 408538 P | US20030647923 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: US 647923 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282310 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282310 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, H03M7/40, H03M7/46, H03M7/48, G06F17/20, G10L19/14 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
G10L19/032 (EP,US);
H03M7/40 (EP,US);
H03M7/4006 (EP,US);
H03M7/4093 (US);
H03M7/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Entropische Kodierung mittels Anpassung des Kodierungsmodus zwischen Niveau- und Lauflängenniveau-Modus | [2011/06] | English: | Entropy coding by adapting coding between level and run-length/level modes | [2011/06] | French: | Codage entropique par adaptation du mode de codage entre le codage à longueur de plage et le codage par niveau | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03020015.8 / EP1400954 | EP06021094.5 / EP1734511 | EP08017491.5 / EP2006840 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030020015) is 15.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2003 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | LU | 03.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
LU | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 25.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0235849 (EYEBALL NETWORKS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,8,15* abstract *; | [A] - DETLEV MARPE ET AL, "Adaptive Codes for H.26L", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20010108), no. VCEG-L13, XP030003159 [A] 1,8,15 * sections 2, 3, 5 * | by applicant | US5883633 | US6223162 | US6233017 | US6300888 | US6304928 | US6377930 | - BELL ET AL., Text Compression, PRENTICE HALL, (1990), pages 105 - 107 | - GIBSON ET AL., Digital Compression for Multimedia, MORGAN KAUFMANN, (1998), pages 17 - 62 | - "Huffman One Better: Arithmetic Coding", NELSON, The Data Compression Book, (1992), pages 123 - 65 |