EP2287752 - Extension of write anywhere file system layout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NetApp, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states NetApp, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Network Appliance, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwars, John, K. 1173 Crandano Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Lewis, Blake, H. 27878 Via Feliz Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
English, Robert M. 4 East Creek Place Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
Hamilton, Eric 1706 Rosedale Avenue Durham, NC 27707 / US | 05 /
Corbett, Peter F. 33 Summer Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2011/08] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181165.1 | 21.04.2005 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US20040836817 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 836817 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287752 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/188 (EP,US);
G06F3/0689 (US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0665 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erweiterung eines Dateisystem-Layouts zum Beschreiben beliebiger Bereiche | [2011/08] | English: | Extension of write anywhere file system layout | [2011/08] | French: | Extension d'agencement de système de fichier à écriture en un endroit quelconque | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05737438.1 / EP1743263 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050737438) is 19.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6148414 (BROWN WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [IY]WO02065275 (YOTTAYOTTA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-6,12-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - page 15, line 16 * [Y] 7-11; | [IY]US2004030822 (RAJAN VIJAYAN [US], et al) [I] 1-6,12-14 * figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0076] * [Y] 7-11; | [A] - CHANG-SOO KIM ET AL, "Volume management in SAN environment", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2001. ICPADS 2001. PROCEEDINGS. EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 26-29 JUNE 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010626), ISBN 0-7695-1153-8, pages 500 - 505, XP010551728 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5819292 | US2002083037 | - DAVID HITZ ET AL., TR3002 File System Design for a NFS File Server Appliance, NETWORK APPLIANCE, INC. | US20020215917 |