EP2293037 - Method and apparatus for leak testing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilco AG Rigackerstrasse 11 5610 Wohlen / CH | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Lehmann, Martin Wannenbühlstrasse 10 5610 Wohlen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, Martin Wannenbühlstrasse 10 5610 Wohlen / CH | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Troesch, Jacques J. Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 10181176.8 | 10.03.1998 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | EP19970108430 | 26.05.1997 Original published format: EP 97108430 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293037 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2293037 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/32 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
G01M3/329 (EP,KR,US);
G01M3/007 (KR);
G01N2203/0222 (KR);
G01N2203/023 (KR);
G01N2203/0248 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Testen auf Lecks | [2011/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for leak testing | [2011/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil de test de fuite | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04013838.0 / EP1469295 | EP98904340.1 / EP1021697 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980904340) is 11.06.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 02.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2526038 (HERBERT NELSON) [A] 1-16 * Leak detector for evacuated systems; column 2 - column 9 *; | [A]DE1473704 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM) [A] 1,8 * Prüfung kleiner Behälter auf Dichtigkeit; page 3 - page 7 *; | [Y]GB2054871 (PFEIFFER VAKUUMTECHNIK) [Y] 9-14,16 * Measuring leakage rates; page 1 - page 2 *; | [Y]US4409817 (EDWARDS JR DAVID [US]) [Y] 2-7,15 * Vakuum leak detection; column 5 - column 8 *; | [IY]DE3340353 (ECKARDT KG PFANNI WERK OTTO [DE]) [I] 1 * Bestimmung von Undichtigkeiten in dichten Behältnissen.; page 5 - page 10 * [Y] 2-7,15; | [A]US4542643 (HIMMELSTEIN SYDNEY [US]) [A] 1,8 * Fluid leak testing method; column 3 - column 6 *; | [A]EP0257159 (NUCLEAR PACKAGING INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * Dewatering nuclear wastes; page 6 - page 32 *; | [A]US5243821 (SCHUCK THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-16* Delivering a continuous quantity of gas over a wide range of flow rates; column 3 - column 7 *; | [IY]WO9318390 (AMERICAN STERILIZER CO [US]) [I] 8 * Detecting liquid in a sterilization system; page 4 - page 20 * [Y] 9-14,16; | [A]US5333677 (MOLIVADAS STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2113845 (FARKAS EDWARD J [CA]) [A] 1-16 * Filling tanks with saturated liquids; page 8 - page 22 * | by applicant | US5239859 | WO9405991 | EP0791814 | US19970862993 |