EP2270797 - Recording medium, playback apparatus, program, playback method, system integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | 01.05.2015 | Change - inventor | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamoto, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Wataru c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Okada, Tomoyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Okubo, Masafumi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/23] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Iwamoto, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Ikeda, Wataru c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Okada, Tomoyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Okubo, Masafumi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181244.4 | 09.11.2004 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | JP20030380464 | 10.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003380464 | JP20040261376 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004261376 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2270797 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2270797 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B27/34, G06F9/445, G06F9/48, H04N9/82, // H04N5/76, H04N5/775, H04N5/781, H04N5/783, H04N5/85, H04N5/907, H04N9/804, H04N9/806 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (KR);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B27/10 (KR);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N5/92 (KR);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B27/34, G06F9/445, G06F9/48, H04N9/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium, Wiedergabevorrichtung, Programm, Wiedergabeverfahren, systemintegrierte Schaltung | [2011/01] | English: | Recording medium, playback apparatus, program, playback method, system integrated circuit | [2011/01] | French: | Support d'enregistrement, dispositif de reproduction, programme, procédé de reproduction, circuit intégré de système | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04818238.0 / EP1691367 | EP08000868.3 / EP1906407 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040818238) is 08.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0104743 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002141741 (ZOU HAN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1672637 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] - [0121] * * paragraphs [0248] - [0262] * * figures 10-21,52-55 *; | [A] - PENG C ET AL, "Digital television application manager", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2001. ICME 2001. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 22-25 AUG. 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010822), ISBN 0-7695-1198-8, pages 1207 - 1210, XP010662062 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2813245B | WO2004025651 | WO2004074976 |