EP2258753 - THERMOPLASTIC FILM STRUCTURES HAVING IMPROVED BARRIER AND MECHANICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Thermoplastic film structures having improved barrier and mechanical properties | ||
[2013/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bemis Company, Inc. One Neenah Center, Fourth Floor 134 E. Wisconsin Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Bemis Company, Inc One Neenah Center, Fourth Floor 134 E. Wisconsin Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE 1, rue de l'Union 92843 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mueller, Chad 637 Waterbury Drive Aurora, IL 60504 / US | 02 /
Kaas, Roger W4840 Escarpment Terrace Sherwood, WI 54169 / US | 03 /
Fillon, Bertrand 42, allee des Noisettes F-38340, Vorpeppe / FR | 04 /
Tournier, Sandrine 50, rue Jean Pain F-38600, Fontaine / FR | 05 /
Lerda, Jean-Jacques Lotissement le Ru du Cras N*1 F-38850, Bilieu / FR | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Mueller, Chad 637 Waterbury Drive Aurora, IL 60504 / US | ||
02 /
Kaas, Roger W4840 Escarpment Terrace Sherwood, WI 54169 / US | |||
03 /
Fillon, Bertrand 42, allee des Noisettes F-38340, Vorpeppe / FR | |||
04 /
Tournier, Sandrine 50, rue Jean Pain F-38600, Fontaine / FR | |||
05 /
Lerda, Jean-Jacques Lotissement le Ru du Cras N*1 F-38850, Bilieu / FR | |||
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Mueller, Chad Apt. 431, 405 South Olde Oneida Street Appleton, WI 54911 / US | ||
02 /
Kaas, Roger W4840 Escarpment Terrace Sherwood, WI 54169 / US | |||
03 /
Fillon, Bertrand 42, allee des Noisettes F-38340, Vorpeppe / FR | |||
04 /
Tournier, Sandrine 50, rue Jean Pain F-38600, Fontaine / FR | |||
05 /
Lerda, Jean-Jacques Lotissement le Ru du Cras N*1 F-38850, Bilieu / FR | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. 9-10 Savile Row GB-London W1S 3PF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10181416.8 | 10.05.2001 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US20000569474 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: US 569474 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258753 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258753 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C08K3/00 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
Y10S428/903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/268 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31765 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE KUNSTSTOFFFOLIE MIT VERBESSERTEN SPERREIGENSCHAFTEN UND MECHANISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2013/16] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC FILM STRUCTURES HAVING IMPROVED BARRIER AND MECHANICAL PROPERTIES | [2013/20] | French: | STRUCTURES DE FILMS THERMOPLASTIQUES POSSEDANT DES PROPRIETES BARRIERE ET MECANIQUES AMELIOREES | [2013/16] |
Former [2010/49] | Thermoplastische Kunststofffolie mit verbesserten Sperreigenschaften und mechanischen Eigenschaften | ||
Former [2010/49] | Thermoplastic film structures having improved barrier and mechanical properties | ||
Former [2010/49] | Structures de films thermoplastiques possedant des proprietes barriere et mecaniques ameliorees | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 16.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01933249.3 / EP1286810 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010933249) is 07.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 11.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO0040404 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [AP] 1 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US2531396 | US5916685 | US5876812 | US5972448 | US5844032 | US5952095 | US5880197 | US5877248 | US5578672 | US5747560 | US5514734 | US5385776 | WO9947598 | WO9935185 | WO9932403 | WO9907790 | WO9853000 | WO9829499 | WO9801346 |