EP2309461 - Method and system for displaying visual content in a virtual three-dimensional space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shefi, Yoav Haperdes 12 64245 Tel Aviv / IL | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Boyce, Conor FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10181521.5 | 22.05.2002 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | US20010293370P | 22.05.2001 Original published format: US 293370 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309461 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/20 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G06T11/206 (EP,US);
G06T15/205 (US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06T15/20 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Sytem zur visuellen Inhaltsanzeige in einem virtuellen 3d Raum | [2011/15] | English: | Method and system for displaying visual content in a virtual three-dimensional space | [2011/15] | French: | Procede et systeme pour afficher un contenu visuel dans un espace virtuel en trois dimensions | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02726405.0 / EP1399890 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020726405) is 23.04.2004 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 28.09.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 28.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 28.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 28.09.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 28.09.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 28.09.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5671381 (STRASNICK STEVEN LARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, lines 44-67 *; | [A]EP1014257 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0017] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0079] , [0080] *; | [A]US6175843 (MURAMOTO TAKAHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,6,8 * abstract ** column 1, lines 18-64 *; | [AD] - ROBERTSON G ET AL, "THE TASK GALLERY: A 3D WINDOW MANAGER", CHI 2000 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS. THE HAQUE, NETHERLANDS, APRIL 1 - 5, 2000, CHI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, NY: ACM, US, (20000401), ISBN 0-201-48563-X, pages 494 - 501, XP001090199 [AD] 1,2,4-8 * page 494; figure 1 * |