EP2369500 - Booking method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BookIT Oy Ajanvarauspalvelu Elimäenkatu 17-19 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2012/51] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Bookit OY Ajanvarauspalvelu Vänrikinkuja 2 02600 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salonen, Jukka Lampitie 57 01810, Luhtajoki / FI | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/51] | Virkkala, Antero Jukka Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/39] | Lipsanen, Jari Seppo Einari Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10181591.8 | 21.08.2003 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | US20020227194 | 21.08.2002 Original published format: US 227194 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2369500 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP);
G06Q10/109 (EP);
H04L67/564 (EP);
H04L67/565 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP);
G08G1/207 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Buchungsverfahren und -system | [2011/39] | English: | Booking method and system | [2011/39] | French: | Procédé et système de réservation | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 23.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 17.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/48] | 11.07.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03792441.2 / EP1546938 | EP10177875.1 / EP2360603 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9809451 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [Y] 1-16 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]WO9830051 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-16 * figure 4 *; | [I]WO0169436 (CODEONLINE OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract *; | [I]EP1159994 (KONAMI CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-16 * figures 1-6 *; | [I]WO0245384 (AGENCY COM LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-16 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10104838 (CENTRIUM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16* claim 1 * |