EP2335921 - Multi-layer films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MonoSolRX, LLC 6560 Melton Road Portage IN 46368 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuisz, Richard C. 1238, Coldwater Creek Canyon Beverly hills, CA 902210 / US | 02 /
Myers, Gary L. 908, Colfax Avenue KINGSPORT, TN 37660 / US | 03 /
Fuisz, Joseph M. 10250 W Bay Harbor Dr. Bay Harbor Island, FL 33154-1204 / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 NL-GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 NL-GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2011/25] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 NL-GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 10181665.0 | 28.09.2005 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20040614863P | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 614863 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335921 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/28, B32B23/08 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
B32B27/28 (EP);
A23L27/79 (EP);
A23L29/262 (EP);
A23P20/20 (EP);
A61K9/0056 (EP);
A61K9/7007 (EP);
B32B23/04 (EP);
B32B23/08 (EP);
B32B23/22 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B9/02 (EP);
B32B9/04 (EP);
B65D65/46 (EP);
A61K9/009 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2307/7166 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Filme | [2011/25] | English: | Multi-layer films | [2011/25] | French: | Films multicouches | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05803856.3 / EP1799453 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050803856) is 26.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5393528 (STAAB ROBERT J [US]); | [A]WO0168452 (STANELCO FIBRE OPTICS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2004009445 (KOSMOS PHARMA [US], et al) | by applicant | US5393528 | US5405637 | US5422127 | US5589357 | US6077558 | US6099871 | US6294206 | US6436464 | US6472003 | US6495599 | US6589576 | US6596302 | US20020074272 | US20040768809 | US20040856176 |