EP2260722 - Process for Preparing Concentrate Thickener Compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simply Thick LLC 200 S. Hanley Road Suite 1102 St. Louis, MO 63105 / US | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holahan, John 7255 Dorset Avenue University City, MO 63160/US / US | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/50] | Setna, Rohan P. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10181826.8 | 02.08.2002 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20010309764P | 02.08.2001 Original published format: US 309764 P | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2260722 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2260722 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/20, A23F5/24, A61K49/04, A23C9/154, A23L2/52, A61K47/36, A61K9/00, A23L29/20, A23L29/206, A23L29/269, A23L29/212, A23L29/238, A23L29/25, A23L29/256, A23L29/262, A23L21/15 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23C9/1544 (EP);
A23C9/206 (EP);
A23L21/15 (EP);
A23L29/212 (EP);
A23L29/238 (EP);
A23L29/25 (EP);
A23L29/256 (EP);
A23L29/262 (EP);
A23L29/27 (EP);
A61K47/36 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K9/0056 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | A23L1/05, A23L1/052, A23L1/054, A23C9/20, A23F5/24, A61K49/04, A23C9/154, A23L1/0522, A23L1/0526, A23L1/053, A23L1/0532, A23L1/0534, A23L1/068, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Konzentratverdickungsmittelzusammensetzungen | [2010/50] | English: | Process for Preparing Concentrate Thickener Compositions | [2010/50] | French: | Processus de préparation de compositions d'épaississant de concentré | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02759246.8 / EP1423019 | EP09005203.6 / EP2078460 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020759246) is 10.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4058636 (IGOE ROBERT S) [A] 1-10 * example 1 *; | [X]US5429837 (BALABAUD CHRISTINE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, lines 45-55; example 1; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US5654027 (CHALUPA WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 1,2 * examples 1,2; claims 1-15 *; | [XI]WO9925208 (RHODIA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 7, lines 24-27; claims 11, 15-21 * * page 9, paragraphs 1-2; examples 4,5 * [I] 4; | [A]EP0920813 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]JPH11187827 (INA FOOD IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11318356 (NISSHIN OIL MILLS LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2000041594 (INA FOOD IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-8 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,10; | [A]US6162471 (SHELDON KATHIE L [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | US6455090 [ ] (UZUHASHI YUJI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 1, lines 6-14, 48-56; claims 1-17 * * column 2, lines 37-40 * * column 3, lines 31-36 * * column 5, lines 5-6, 23-31, 57-58; figure 3 * * column 6, lines 43-45 *; | [X] - KING A H, "Concentrated gellan gum gel (5%) suitable to gel various other systems (a universal gelling agent)", FSTA, (19960112), XP002305761 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | - FEDERAL REGISTER, (19930826), pages 45194 - 45201 |