EP2287753 - Method for informative description of image objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberger, Frank Tannenstraße 4 40668, Meerbusch / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Weisse, Renate Bleibtreustraße 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Weisse, Renate Patentanwälte Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181834.2 | 17.12.2004 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | DE20041001595 | 09.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004001595 | [2011/08] | Previously filed application, date | EP20040029975 | 17.12.2004 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287753 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/9537 (EP);
G06F16/58 (EP);
G06V30/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur informativen Beschreibung von Bildobjekten | [2011/08] | English: | Method for informative description of image objects | [2011/08] | French: | Procédé pour la description informatif des objets d'image | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04029975.2 / EP1553507 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040029975) is 14.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03079276 (MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0022] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0031] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0073] *; | [X]US2002102966 (LEV TSVI H [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0046] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0063] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] *; | [X]WO0149056 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 23 - page 8, line 21 *; | [X] - TOYAMA K U A, "Geographic location tags on digital images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 11TH ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA, BERKELEY, CA, USA, ACM Press, USA, (20031102), ISBN 1-58113-722-2, pages 156 - 166, XP002408232 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * pages 156-157, paragraphs 1,2 * * pages 160-162, paragraphs 5,5.3,5.6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/957013.957046 |