EP2298666 - Resealable Food Container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sierra-Gomez, Gladys Odette 60 Golden Square Woodbridge, NJ 07095 / US | 02 /
Peters, Eva Marie 21 Cole Road Cedar Grove, NJ 07009 / US | 03 /
Stiener, Joseph 10 Mountain Court Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 04 /
Flynn, Charles Francis IV 4 Madoc Trail Oak Ridge, NJ 07438 / US | 05 /
Mandle, James Spencer 22 Arcadia road Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/34] | Murray, Adrian D'Coligny WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10181886.2 | 16.04.2004 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20030414502 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 414502 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2298666 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2298666 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65D77/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B65D75/5838 (EP,US);
B65D77/003 (EP,US);
B65D2401/00 (EP,US);
B65D2585/363 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wieder abdichtbarer Lebensmittelbehälter | [2011/12] | English: | Resealable Food Container | [2011/12] | French: | Récipient alimentaire refermable | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 31.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/11] | Appeal following examination | 13.04.2017 | Appeal received No. T1690/17 | 26.06.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 22.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04252257.3 / EP1468936 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040252257) is 24.01.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09156677 ; | [Y]US3331501 (STEWART JR CHARLES R) [Y] 1,8,11,13* column 2, line 24 - line 66; figure 4 *; | [Y]US3740238 (GRAHAM S) [Y] 1-5,7-15 * column 2, line 58 - line 65; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0474981 (BARILLA FLLI G & R [IT]) [Y] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0613824 (IACHETTI ANTONIETTA CINZIA [DE]) [Y] 1,8,10 * column 4, line 7 - line 23; figures 2,3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09156677 A 19970617 (FUJI SEAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,7-9,12,14,15 * abstract * | Examination | US3331501 | EP0474981 | EP0613824 | JPH09156677 | by applicant | US4840270 | US6026963 | USD447054S | US2002182359 |