EP2324805 - Absorbent core for an absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.11.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE, FR | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busam, Ludwig Talstr. 17 65510, Hünstetten / DE | 02 /
Stiehl, Gabriele Prof. Much-Str. 10 65812, Bad Soden / DE | 03 /
Tombuelt-Meyer, Thomas Auf dem Hielig 16 53947, Nettersheim / DE | 04 /
Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes Taunusstr. 10 c 65812, Bad Soden / DE | 05 /
Divo, Michael Feldbergstr. 14 61381, Friedrichsdorf / DE | 06 /
Becker, Uwe Jürgen Kirchheimer Str. 78 53881, Euskirchen / DE | 07 /
Engel, Roland Kelkheimer Str. 8 65823, Sulzbach / DE | 08 /
Lindner, Torsten Berliner Platz 4 61476, Kronberg / DE | 09 /
Link, Siegfried In der Höll 4 53937, Schleiden / DE | 10 /
Maier, Volker In den Essigbenden 61 53879, Euskirchen / DE | 11 /
Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir 40, Champ du Roi 1040, Etterbeek / BE | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
Busam, Ludwig Talstr. 17 65510, Hünstetten / DE | ||
02 /
Stiehl, Gabriele Prof. Much-Str. 10 65812, Bad Soden / DE | |||
03 /
Tombuelt-Meyer, Thomas Auf dem Hielig 16 53947, Nettersheim / DE | |||
04 /
Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes Taunusstr. 10 c 65812, Bad Soden / DE | |||
05 /
Divo, Michael Feldbergstr. 14 61381, Friedrichsdorf / DE | |||
06 /
Becker, Uwe Jürgen Kirchheimer Str. 78 53881, Euskirchen / DE | |||
07 /
Engel, Roland Kelkheimer Str. 8 65823, Sulzbach / DE | |||
08 /
Lindner, Torsten Berliner Platz 4 61476, Kronberg / DE | |||
09 /
Link, Siegfried In der Höll 4 53937, Schleiden / DE | |||
10 /
Maier, Volker In den Essigbenden 61 53879, Euskirchen / DE | |||
11 /
Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir 40, Champ du Roi 1040, Etterbeek / BE | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182065.2 | 12.02.2003 | [2011/21] | Previously filed application, date | EP20070122173 | 12.02.2003 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324805 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2324805 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/532, A61F13/536, A61F13/15, A61F13/53, A61F13/539 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A61F13/15658 (EP,US);
A61F13/49 (KR);
A61F13/5323 (US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/15699 (EP,US);
A61F13/53 (KR);
A61F13/534 (KR);
A61F13/536 (EP,US);
A61F13/539 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530547 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5395 (EP,US);
B32B2310/024 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | A61F13/536, A61F13/539, A61F13/15, A61F13/53 | ||
Former IPC [2011/21] | A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | Saugfähiger Kern für einen saugfähigen Artikel | [2011/21] | English: | Absorbent core for an absorbent article | [2011/21] | French: | Partie centrale absorbante pour un article absorbant | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 04.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03002678.5 / EP1447067 | EP07122173.3 / EP1913912 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030002678) is 07.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Essity Hygiene and Health AB Essity IP Department 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2018/31] |
Former [2014/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | 22.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.03.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.10.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/53] | Appeal following opposition | 21.06.2016 | Appeal received No. T1467/16 | 30.08.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2003 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | IE | 12.02.2014 | LU | 12.02.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | ES | 13.02.2018 | FR | 29.02.2020 | DE | 01.09.2020 | [2021/07] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.02.2003 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
ES | 13.02.2018 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.02.2003 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
SE | 13.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3670731 (HARMON CARLYLE) [X] 1,3-5,10-13,15 * column 4, line 71 - column 6, line 6; figures 4-6 *; | [X]US4055180 (KARAMI HAMZEH) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * column 3, line 23 - line 48 * * column 6, line 25 - line 51; figure - *; | [AD]US4381783 (ELIAS ROBERT T) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US5425725 (TANZER RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 19, line 53 - column 22, line 29; figure - * * column 13, line 28 - column 14, line 37 * * column 28, line 66 - column 29, line 6 *; | [X]US2002102392 (FISH JEFFREY E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-12,15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069]; figure - *; | [X]US2002115969 (MAEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0120]; figure - * | by applicant | US5425725 | WO9517868 | EP0724418 |