EP2302418 - Silicon oxyfluoride glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Robert L. 7147 Lakeside Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | 02 /
Moore, Lisa A. 7 West 4th Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | 03 /
Smith, Charlene M. 222 Watauga Avenue Corning, NY 14830 / US | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Maier, Robert L. 7147 Lakeside Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | ||
02 /
Moore, Lisa A. 7 West 4th Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | |||
03 /
Smith, Charlene M. 222 Watauga Avenue Corning, NY 14830 / US | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10182172.6 | 27.02.2001 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20000195682P | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 195682 P | US20000567725 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: US 567725 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2302418 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302418 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/00, C03C17/02, C03C17/34, C03B19/14, G02B1/10 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
C03C17/02 (EP,US);
C03B19/1453 (EP,US);
C03B19/1461 (EP,US);
C03C17/3452 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
G02B1/105 (EP);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02B5/208 (EP,US);
G03F7/70958 (EP,US);
C03B2201/075 (EP,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
C03C2201/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | G02B3/00, C03C17/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Siliziumoxyfluoridglas | [2011/13] | English: | Silicon oxyfluoride glass | [2011/13] | French: | Verre d'oxyfluoride de silicium | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01914510.1 / EP1295153 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010914510) is 22.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | IE | 27.02.2013 | LU | 27.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | GB | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0488320 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 39-48 * * column 4, lines 20-25 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 4; example 6 *; | [Y]EP0588718 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 2,7-10 * abstract *; | [Y] - LIBERMAN V ET AL, "Materials issues for optical components and photomasks in 157 nm lithography", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICSPROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19991101), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1116/1.590994, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 3273 - 3279, XP012007918 [Y] 1-10 * section IV, reticles, section V, page 3276, 2nd par. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.590994 | [A] - MOORE L A ET AL, "PROPERTIES OF FUSED SILICA FOR 157NM PHOTOMASKS", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, USA, (19990901), vol. 3873, doi:10.1117/12.373334, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 392 - 401, XP009003018 [A] 1-10 * page 392, paragraph 6 * * item 3.1; page 393, paragraphs 1,4,5 * * item 3.2,3.3; page 394 * * first and two last paragraphs; page 395; figures 2-4,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.373334 | [A] - ARAUJO R J ET AL, "Induced absorption in silica (A preliminary model)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE ON INORGANIC OPTICAL MATERIALS, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, The International Society for Optical Engineering SPIE, USA, (19980719), vol. 3424, doi:10.1117/12.323748, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 2 - 9, XP002617383 [A] 8-10 * summary item 5; page 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.323748 | by applicant | - LH. MALITOSON, "Interspecimen Comparison of the Refractive Index of Fused Silica", J. OPT. SOC. AMERICA, (1965), vol. 55, no. 10, pages 1205 - 1209 | US19820001956 |