EP2293031 - Method and apparatus for performing optical imaging using frequency-domain interferometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yun, Seok Hyun, Ph. D. 30 Cambridge Park Drive Apt. 4128 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 02 /
Bouma, Brett Eugene, Ph. D. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | 03 /
Tearney, Guillermo J., MD, Ph. D. 12 Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
de Boer, Johannes Fitzgerald, Ph. D 60 C Marshall Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | [2024/09] |
Former [2024/07] | 01 /
Yun, Seok Hyun, Ph. D. 30 Cambridge Park Drive Apt. 4128 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | ||
02 /
Bouma, Brett Eugene, Ph. D. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | |||
03 /
Tearney, Guillermo J., MD, Ph. D. 12 Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
04 /
Boer, Johannes Fitzgerald, Ph. D 60 C Marshall Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Yun, Seok Hyun, Ph. D. 30 Cambridge Park Drive Apt. 4128 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | ||
02 /
Bouma, Brett Eugene, Ph. D. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | |||
03 /
Tearney, Guillermo J., MD, Ph. D. 12 Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
04 /
Boer, Johannes Fitzgerald de, Ph. D 60 C Marshall Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2011/10] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182394.6 | 08.09.2004 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20030514769P | 27.10.2003 Original published format: US 514769 P | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293031 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2293031 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293031 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2293031 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/18, H01S3/10, G01J3/02, G01J3/10, G01N21/47, A61B5/00, G02B27/48, G01B9/02 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
G01J9/02 (KR);
H01S5/5045 (US);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
G01B9/02 (KR);
G01B9/02002 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (EP);
G01B9/02043 (US);
G01B9/02075 (US);
G01B9/02081 (EP,US);
G01B9/02083 (US);
G01B9/02084 (US);
G01B9/0209 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/021 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (EP,US);
G01J3/0264 (EP,US);
G01J3/453 (EP,US);
G01J9/00 (KR);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
G02B26/12 (US);
G02B27/48 (EP,US);
G02B6/3604 (US);
G02F1/093 (EP,US);
G02F1/11 (EP,US);
H01S3/0071 (US);
H01S3/0078 (US);
H01S5/0071 (US);
H01S5/0078 (US);
H01S5/1025 (US);
H01S5/14 (US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
G01B2290/45 (EP,US);
G01B2290/70 (EP,US);
G01J9/0215 (EP,US);
H01S3/08009 (EP,US);
H01S3/08063 (EP,US);
H01S3/105 (EP,US);
H01S3/1068 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für eine Lichtquelle mit Abstimmung der Wellenlänge | [2011/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for performing optical imaging using frequency-domain interferometry | [2011/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour une source de lumière à réglage de longueur d'onde | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2023 | 28.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | 10.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04788614.8 / EP1685366 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040788614) is 09.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - S. H. YUN ET AL, "High-speed wavelength-swept semiconductor laser with a polygon-scanner-based wavelength filter", OPTICS LETTERS, (20031015), vol. 28, no. 20, doi:10.1364/OL.28.001981, ISSN 0146-9592, page 1981, XP055196878 [X] 1-4,6-9,21-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.28.001981 | [X] - AMY L. OLDENBURG ET AL, "Fast-Fourier-Domain Delay Line for in vivo Optical Coherence Tomography with a Polygonal Scanner", APPLIED OPTICS, (20030101), vol. 42, no. 22, doi:10.1364/AO.42.004606, ISSN 0003-6935, page 4606, XP055197224 [X] 1-4,6-9,21-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.42.004606 | [X] - SANDERS S T ED - D'AMATO FRANCESCO ET AL, "WAVELENGTH-AGILE FIBER LASER USING GROUP-VELOCITY DISPERSION OF PULSED SUPER-CONTINUA AND APPLICATION TO BROADBAND ABSORPTION SPECTROSCOPY", APPLIED PHYSICS B: LASERS AND OPTICS, SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL, BERLIN, DE, (20021101), vol. B75, no. 6-07, doi:10.1007/S00340-002-1044-Z, ISSN 0946-2171, pages 799 - 802, XP009066730 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00340-002-1044-z | Examination | WO2005001401 | - CHINN S R ET AL, "OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY USING A FREEQUENCY-TUNABLE OPTICAL SOURCE", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19970301), vol. 22, no. 5, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 340 - 342, XP000684683 | by applicant | US5321501 | US5956355 | US6160826 | US6341036 | US2002198457 |