EP2264718 - Method for producing oxide superconducting wire material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/51] | Method for producing oxide superconducting wire material, method for modifying oxide superconducting wire material, and oxide superconducting wire material | ||
[2013/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, S. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5548511 / JP | 02 /
Kato, T. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5548511 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, K. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5548511 / JP | [2014/01] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Kobayashi, S. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5548511 / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, T. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5548511 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamazaki, K. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5548511 / JP | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [2014/01] |
Former [2010/51] | Kreutzer, Ulrich Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182495.1 | 04.08.2004 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | JP20030304536 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003304536 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264718 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264718 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264718 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H10N60/0801 (EP,US);
H01B12/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | H01B13/00, H01B12/04, H01B12/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [2010/51] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR OXIDSUPRALEITENDES DRAHTMATERIAL | [2013/28] | English: | Method for producing oxide superconducting wire material | [2013/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET DE MODIFICATION D'UN FIL D'OXYDE SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [2013/28] |
Former [2010/51] | Herstellungsverfahren für oxidsupraleitendes Drahtmaterial, Aenderungsverfahren für oxidsupraleitendes Drahtmaterial und oxidsupraleitendes Drahtmaterial | ||
Former [2010/51] | Method for producing oxide superconducting wire material, method for modifying oxide superconducting wire material, and oxide superconducting wire material | ||
Former [2010/51] | Procédé de production et de modification d'un fil d'oxyde supraconducteur et fil d'oxyde supraconducteur ainsi obtenu | Examination procedure | 28.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 31.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04771174.2 / EP1659595 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040771174) is 15.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | GB | 04.08.2014 | FR | 01.09.2014 | [2016/29] |
Former [2015/38] | DK | 01.01.2014 | |
GB | 04.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | DK | 01.01.2014 | |
GB | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | DK | 01.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6069116 (LI QI [US], et al); | [A]WO0122436 (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH05101723 | JP2592846B |