EP2264700 - Coding apparatus and decoding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshikiri, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182526.3 | 15.09.2004 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | JP20030323658 | 16.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003323658 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264700 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02, G10L19/02 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,BR);
G10L19/02 (BR);
G10L19/0208 (EP);
G10L19/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/51] | Title | German: | Codierungsvorrichtung und Decodierungsvorrichtung | [2010/51] | English: | Coding apparatus and decoding apparatus | [2010/51] | French: | Appareil de codage et appareil de décodage | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 03.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04787895.4 / EP1657710 | EP09156970.7 / EP2071565 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040787895) is 06.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03007480 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,9 * abstract *; | [XYI]US2003093271 (TSUSHIMA MINEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0054] , [0064] , [0065] , [0067] , [0070] , [0105] - [0110] * [Y] 2,3,9 [I] 6,7,12,13; | EP1351401 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0009] , [0011] , [0015] , [0016] , [0018] , [0019] , [0021]; figure 4 *; | [XP] - OSHIKIRI M ET AL, "Efficient spectrum coding for super-wideband speech and its application to 7/10/15 KHz bandwidth scalable coders", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP '04). IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA 17-21 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040517), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8484-9, pages 481 - 484, XP010717670 [XP] 1-15 * abstract * *section 3* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326027 |