EP2316556 - Filter cartridge and filter assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/18] | Liquid filter arrangements | ||
[2014/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94 Street Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greco, Enrico Via Giorgio Perlasca 23 46020 VILLA POMA, MANTOVA / IT | 02 /
Buratto, Fabrizio Via Breda 313 46030 SUSTINENTE, MANTOVA / IT | 03 /
Cantoni, Mauro Vicolo Ducale, 11 46100 MANTOVA / IT | 04 /
Guernieri, Christian Via Mantegna 18 46036 REVERE MANTOVA / IT | 05 /
Connelly, John Francis 900 Saddlebrook Curve CHANHASSEN 55317 / US | 06 /
Hacker, John R. 5617 Harriet Ave. So. MINNEAPOLIS 55419 / US | 07 /
Formica, Claudio F. Cavallotti, 24 46030 Pomponesco / IT | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Greco, Enrico Via Giorgio Perlasca 23 46020 VILLA POMA, MANTOVA / IT | ||
02 /
Buratto, Fabrizio Via Breda 313 46030 SUSTINENTE, MANTOVA / IT | |||
03 /
Cantoni, Mauro Vicolo Ducale, 11 46100 MANTOVA / IT | |||
04 /
Guernieri, Christian Via Mantegna 18 46036 REVERE MANTOVA / IT | |||
05 /
Connelly, John Francis 900 Saddlebrook Curve CHANHASSEN 55317 / US | |||
06 /
Hacker, John R. 5617 Harriet Ave. So. MINNEAPOLIS 55419 / US | |||
07 /
Formica, Claudio F. Cavallotti, 24 46030 Pomponesco / IT | |||
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Greco, Enrico Via Rosselli 20 46035 VILLA POMA, MANTOVA / IT | ||
02 /
Buratto, Fabrizio Via Breda 313 46030 SUSTINENTE, MANTOVA / IT | |||
03 /
Cantoni, Mauro Vicolo Ducale, 11 46100 MANTOVA / IT | |||
04 /
Guernieri, Christian Via Mantegna 18 46036 REVERE MANTOVA / IT | |||
05 /
Connelly, John Francis 900 Saddlebrook Curve CHANHASSEN 55317 / US | |||
06 /
Hacker, John R. 5617 Harriet Ave. So. MINNEAPOLIS 55419 / US | |||
07 /
Formica, Claudio F. Cavallotti, 24 46030 Pomponesco / IT | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/18] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182618.8 | 16.06.2005 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | US20040583873P | 29.06.2004 Original published format: US 583873 P | US20040609602P | 13.09.2004 Original published format: US 609602 P | US20050659592P | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 659592 P | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316556 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2316556 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/153 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
B01D35/153 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (US);
B01D35/143 (EP,US);
B01D35/147 (EP);
B01D35/1573 (US);
B01D2201/167 (US);
B01D2201/291 (US);
B01D2201/295 (EP,US);
B01D2201/302 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D35/143, B01D35/147, B01D35/153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | Filterpatrone und Filteranordnung | [2014/09] | English: | Filter cartridge and filter assembly | [2014/09] | French: | Cartouche filtrante et agencement de filtration | [2014/09] |
Former [2011/18] | Flüssigkeitsfilteranordnungen | ||
Former [2011/18] | Liquid filter arrangements | ||
Former [2011/18] | Agencements de filtres liquides | Examination procedure | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05766072.2 / EP1781396 | Divisional application(s) | EP14172879.0 / EP2865432 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050766072) is 25.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2005 | AT | 13.08.2014 | BE | 13.08.2014 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | ES | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2471803 (MANITOU BF [FR]) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [A]US2002017497 (FRITZE KARL [US]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0045]; figure 11 *; | [I]US2003127384 (KAPUR DESH [US]) [I] 1-3,8-12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * figure - * |