EP2287557 - Transparent Ceramic Composite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Ceramics and Plastics, Inc. 1 New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Christopher D. 41 Courthouse Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | 02 /
Rioux, Jeffrey, B. 36 Sonoma Drive Bedford, NH 03110 / US | 03 /
Locher, John, W. 10 Colonel Wilkins Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | 04 /
Carlson, Eric, S. 27 Valley Road East Kunkletown, PA 18058 / US | 05 /
Farrell, Kathleen, R. 302 South 2nd Street Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | 06 /
Furchner, Brian, C. 9020 Wertman Road Fogelsville, PA 18051 / US | 07 /
Pluen, Vincent 33 Allée des coudriers 45240 Marcilly en Villette / FR | 08 /
Mandelartz, Matthias Forstumer Strasse 7 52134, Herzogenrath / DE | [2011/29] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Jones, Christopher D. 41 Courthouse Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | ||
02 /
Rioux, Jeffrey, B. 36 Sonoma Drive Bedford, NH 03110 / US | |||
03 /
Locher, John, W. 10 Colonel Wilkins Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | |||
04 /
Carlson, Eric, S. 27 Valley Road East Kunkletown, PA 18058 / US | |||
05 /
Farrell, Kathleen, R. 302 South 2nd Street Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | |||
06 /
Furchner, Brian, C. 9020 Wertman Road Fogelsville, PA 18051 / US | |||
07 /
Pluen, Vincent 11, rue du Docteur Hervé F-41600 Lamotte Beuvron / FR | |||
08 /
Mandelartz, Matthias Forstumer Strasse 7 52134, Herzogenrath / DE | |||
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
Jones, Christopher D. 41 Courthouse Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | ||
02 /
Rioux, Jeffrey, B. 36 Sonoma Drive Bedford, NH 03110 / US | |||
03 /
Locher, John, W. 10 Colonel Wilkins Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | |||
04 /
Carlson, Eric, S. 27 Valley Road East Kunkletown, PA 18058 / US | |||
05 /
Farrell, Kathleen, R. 302 South 2nd Street Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | |||
06 /
Furchner, Brian, C. 9020 Wertman Road Fogelsville, PA 18051 / US | |||
07 /
Pluen, Vincent 54, Rue Auguste Rodin F-77181, Courtry / FR | |||
08 /
Mandelartz, Matthias Wolfstrasse 26 51234, Herzogenrath / DE | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstrasse 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10183045.3 | 09.06.2006 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US20050689688P | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 689688 P | US20060761814P | 25.01.2006 Original published format: US 761814 P | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287557 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/04, B32B17/10, // C30B15/34 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
B32B17/1077 (EP,US);
B32B17/10009 (EP,US);
B32B17/10045 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B17/10853 (EP,US);
F41H5/0407 (EP,US);
F41H5/0414 (EP,US);
F41H5/0428 (EP,US);
B32B2369/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | Transparenter keramischer Verbund | [2011/08] | English: | Transparent Ceramic Composite | [2011/08] | French: | Composite céramique transparent | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06772823.8 / EP1888996 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060772823) is 19.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03068501 (AGP EUROP GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 13, line 17 - page 14, line 16; figure - *; | [Y] - PARIMAL J. PATEL, GARY A. GILDE, PETER G. DEHMER, JAMES W. MCCAULEY, "Transparent Armor", THE AMPTIAC NEWSLETTER, FALL 2000, Rome, New York, vol. 4, no. 3, (2000), URL: http://www.p2pays.org/ref/34/33126.pdf, (20061106), XP002405973 [Y] 1-15 * pages 1-5,13 * | [Y] - R. GENTILMAN, P.MCGUIRE, D. FIORE, K. OSTREICHER, J. ASKINAZI, "Large-area sapphire windows", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, vol. 5078, (2003), pages 54 - 60, URL: http://www.matsysinc.com/products/ceramics/docs/large_area_sapphire.pdf, (20061106), XP002405974 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.501435 | [I] - "Emerging Scanning Results: Transparent Ceramics", PARTNERSHIP FOR ADVANCING TECHNOLOGY IN HOUSING, (20030414), URL: http://www.pathnet.org/sp.asp?id=7539, (20061106), XP002405975 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - R. GENTILMAN, P.MCGUIRE, D. FIORE, K. OSTREICHER, J. ASKINAZI, "Low-cost sapphire windows", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, vol. 5078, (2003), pages 12 - 17, URL: http://www.matsysinc.com/products/ceramics/docs/low_cost_sapphire.pdf, (20061106), XP002405976 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.488241 | by applicant | US20040820468 |