EP2298893 - Methods and compositions involving miRNA and miRNA inhibitor molecules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asuragen, Inc. 2150 Woodward St Suite 100 Austin TX 78744 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, David 2150 Woodward St., Suite 100 Austin, TX 78744 / US | 02 /
Ford, Lance 450 Harris Drive Austin, TX 78737 / US | 03 /
Cheng, Angie 1215 W. Slaughter Lane, Apt. 525 Austin, TX 78748 / US | 04 /
Jarvis, Rich 13039 North Hunters Circle San Antonio, TX 78230 / US | 05 /
Byrom, Mike 5901 E. Stassney, Apt. 1203 Austin, TX 78744 / US | 06 /
Ovcharenko, Dmitriy 4020 South Industrial Dr. Suite 130 Austin, TX 78744 / US | 07 /
Devroe, Eric 702 Geyser Ave. Pflugerville, TX 78660 / US | 08 /
Kelnar, Kevin 201 Primrose Drive Kyle, TX 78640 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 10183470.3 | 14.11.2005 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20040627171P | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 627171 P | US20050649634P | 03.02.2005 Original published format: US 649634 P | US20050683736P | 23.05.2005 Original published format: US 683736 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298893 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/1136 (US);
C12Q1/68 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,US);
C12N2310/312 (US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,US);
C12N2310/33 (US);
C12N2310/344 (US);
C12N2310/35 (US);
C12N2310/351 (US);
C12N2310/3527 (US);
C12N2310/3535 (US);
C12N2310/533 (US);
C12N2320/12 (EP,US);
C12N2320/30 (EP,US);
C12N2320/50 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen, die miRNAs und miRNA-inhibitorischen Molekülen verbunden sind | [2011/12] | English: | Methods and compositions involving miRNA and miRNA inhibitor molecules | [2011/12] | French: | Procédés et compositions impliquant l'ARNmi et des molécules inhibitrices de l'ARNmi | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05858321.2 / EP1838852 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050858321) is 11.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004066183 (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY LAB EMBL [DE], et al); | by applicant | US1529202 | GB1529202 | US4337063 | US4404289 | US4405711 | US4659774 | US4682195 | US4683202 | US4684611 | US4704362 | EP0266032 | US4816571 | US4828979 | US4849513 | US4910300 | EP0373203 | US4952500 | US4959463 | US5141813 | US5143854 | US5202231 | US5214136 | US5221619 | US5223618 | WO9317126 | US5242974 | US5264566 | US5268486 | US5288644 | US5302523 | WO9409699 | US5322783 | US5324633 | US5378825 | US5384253 | US5384261 | WO9506128 | US5405783 | US5412087 | WO9511995 | US5424186 | US5428148 | US5429807 | US5432049 | US5436327 | WO9521265 | WO9521944 | US5446137 | US5445934 | US5464765 | US5466786 | US5468613 | US5470967 | US5470710 | US5472672 | WO9535505 | US5480980 | US5492806 | US5503980 | US5510270 | US5525464 | US5527681 | US5529756 | US5532128 | US5538877 | US5538880 | US5545531 | US5547839 | US5550318 | US5554744 | US5554501 | US5556752 | US5561071 | US5563055 | WO9631622 | US5571639 | US5574146 | US5573913 | US5580859 | US5580726 | US5580732 | US5583013 | US5589466 | US5591616 | US5593839 | US5599695 | US5599672 | US5602240 | US5602244 | US5610289 | US5610042 | US5610287 | WO9710365 | US5614617 | US5623070 | US5624711 | US5631134 | US5637683 | US5639603 | US5645897 | EP0785280 | US5652099 | WO9727317 | US5654413 | US5656610 | US5658734 | US5661028 | US5665547 | US5667972 | US5670663 | US5672697 | EP0799897 | US5681947 | WO9743450 | US5695940 | US5700922 | US5700637 | US5702932 | US5705629 | US5708154 | US5714606 | US5728525 | US5736524 | US5744305 | US5763167 | US5777092 | US5780448 | US5789215 | US5792847 | US5800992 | US5807522 | US5830645 | US5837196 | US5844107 | US5859221 | US5858988 | US5872232 | US5871928 | US5876932 | US5877302 | US5886165 | WO9923256 | US5919626 | WO9935505 | WO9936760 | US5945100 | US5972901 | US5972900 | US5981274 | US5994624 | US6004755 | US6008336 | US6077835 | US6087102 | WO0071096 | US6200801 | WO0138580 | US6251666 | US6262252 | WO0168255 | US6368799 | US6376179 | US6383749 | US2002150626 | US2003032615 | WO03020898 | WO03023058 | WO03022421 | WO03029485 | WO03040410 | WO03053586 | WO03067217 | WO03066906 | US6617112 | WO03076928 | WO03087297 | US6638717 | US2003203865 | WO03091426 | WO03093810 | WO03100012 | WO03100448 | WO2004020085 | US2004048787 | WO2004027093 | US6720138 | US6723509 | US6770291 | GB19880003000 | US20040575743 | US20050649584 | US20050141707 |