EP2261373 - Evolution of whole cells and organisms by recursive sequence recombination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codexis Mayflower Holdings, LLC 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2011/33] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Maxygen Inc. 515 Galveston Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
del Cardayre, Stephen B. 611 Southview CT Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 02 /
Tobin, Matthew B. 2072 Eaton Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
Stemmer, Willem P. C. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 04 /
Ness, Jon E. 1220 N. Fairoaks Avenue 3115 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 05 /
Minshull, Jeremy 11 Homer Lane Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 06 /
Patten, Phillip 261 La Cuesta Drive Menlo Park, CA 94028 / US | [2012/27] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
DEL CARDAYRE, Stephen, B. 611 Southview CT Belmont, CA 94002 / US | ||
02 /
TOBIN, Matthew, B. 2072 Eaton Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
03 /
STEMMER, Willem, P., C. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | |||
04 /
NESS, Jon, E. 1220 N. Fairoaks Avenue 3115 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
05 /
MINSHULL, Jeremy 11 Homer Lane Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
06 /
PATTEN, Phillip 261 La Cuesta Drive Menlo Park, CA 94028 / US | |||
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
DEL CARDAYRE, Stephen, B. 611 Southview CT Belmont, CA 94002 / US | ||
02 /
TOBIN, Matthew, B. 2072 Eaton Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
03 /
STEMMER, Willem, P., C. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | |||
04 /
NESS, Jon, E. 1220 N. Fairoaks Avenue 3115 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
05 /
MINSHULL, Jeremy 11 Homer Lane Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
06 /
PATTEN, Phillip 261 La Cuesta Drive Menlo Park, CA 94028 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10183826.6 | 16.01.1998 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US19970035054P | 17.01.1997 Original published format: US 35054 P | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2261373 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2261373 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/00, A01H1/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/1027 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/09 (KR);
C12N15/111 (KR);
C12N15/8271 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8273 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8279 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Evolution prokaryotischer ganzer Zellen durch rekursive Sequenzrekombination | [2010/50] | English: | Evolution of whole cells and organisms by recursive sequence recombination | [2010/50] | French: | Evolution de cellules procaryotes entières par recombinaison recursive de séquences | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06076134.3 / EP1717322 | EP98902586.1 / EP1007732 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980902586) is 05.09.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 18   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2015 | 31.01.2016 | 19   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9522625 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X] - ZUBRZYCKI L ET AL, "GENETIC HETEROLOGY BETWEEN ESCHERICHIA-COLI K-12 AND A SMOOTH STRAIN OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1969), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1287, pages 115 - 123, XP002649392 [X] 1,2 * page 121 - page 122 * | [X] - MIRDAMADI-TEHRANI J ET AL, "INTERSPECIFIC PROTOPLAST FUSION AND GENETIC RECOMBINATION BETWEEN STREPTOMYCES GRISEUS AND STREPTOMYCES GRISEOLUS", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920101), vol. 91, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0378-1097(92)90682-E, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 187 - 192, XP008011786 [X] 1,3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1097(92)90682-E | [X] - HOPWOOD D A, "OPENING ADDRESS THE MANY FACES OF RECOMBINATION", GENETICS OF INDUSTRIAL MICROORGANISMS, XX, XX, (19790101), pages 1 - 09, XP001133818 [X] 1,3 * the whole document * | [X] - ZINDER, NORTON D., LEDERBERG, JOSHUA, "Genetic Exchange in Salmonella", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1952), vol. 64, no. 5, pages 679 - 699, XP002649393 [X] 1 * page 697 * * page 694 * * page 693 * | [A] - IKEDA H ET AL, "IMPROVEMENT OF MACROLIDE ANTIBIOTIC-PRODUCING STREPTOMYCETE STRAINS BY THE REGENERATION OF PROTOPLASTS", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (19830101), vol. 36, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 283 - 288, XP001109418 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - HAMLYN P F ET AL, "RECOMBINATION STUDIES WITH CEPHALOSPORIUM ACREMONIUM", GENETICS OF INDUSTRIAL MICROORGANISMS, XX, XX, (19790101), pages 185 - 191, XP001133817 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - STEMMER W P C, "USING RECOMBINATION TO SEARCH MORE EFFICIENTLY AND THOROUGHLY INSTEAD OF MAKING BIGGER COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES", BIOTECHNOLOGY, BUTTERWORTHS, LONDON, GB, (19950601), vol. 13, doi:10.1038/NBT0695-549, ISSN 0740-7378, pages 549 - 553, XP001019027 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0695-549 | [A] - NGUYEN DUC THANH ET AL, "LIMITED CHLOROPLAST GENE TRANSFER VIA RECOMBINATION OVERCOMES PLASTOME-GENOME INCOMPATIBILITY BETWEEN NICOTIANA TABACUM AND SOLANUM TUBEROSUM", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (19890101), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF00017450, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 87 - 93, XP002942723 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00017450 | [A] - LENNOX ET AL, "Transduction of linked genetic characters of the host by bacteriophage P1", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, vol. 1, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0042-6822(55)90016-7, ISSN 0042-6822, (19550701), pages 190 - 206, (19550701), XP023052264 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(55)90016-7 | [A] - MATSUSHIMA P ET AL, "Conjugal transfer of cosmid DNA from Escherichia coli to Saccharopolyspora spinosa: effects of chromosomal insertions on macrolide A83543 production", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940101), vol. 146, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(94)90831-1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 39 - 45, XP002106258 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90831-1 | [A] - ROWLANDS R T, "INDUSTRIAL STRAIN IMPROVEMENT: RATIONAL SCREENS AND GENETIC RECOMBINATION TECHNIQUES", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, (19840701), vol. 6, doi:10.1016/0141-0229(84)90056-5, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 290 - 300, XP000197039 [A] 1,3 * page 293, column r, paragraph 4 * * page 294, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(84)90056-5 | by applicant | US4407956 | WO8501856 | US4608339 | US4677066 | US4873196 | US4970154 | US5250433 | WO9320233 | US5360725 | US5426040 | WO9522625 | US5527674 | US5605820 | US5627059 | - BLATTNER ET AL., CIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 1454 - 1462 | - KUNST ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 390, pages 249 - 256 | - MAO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1997), vol. 179, pages 417 - 422 | - JENSE; GERDES, MOL. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 205 - 210 | - BERNARD ET AL., GENE, vol. 162, pages 159 - 160 | - PATI ET AL., MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF CANCER, (1996), vol. 1, page 1 | - SENA; ZARLING, NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 3, page 365 | - REVET ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 232, pages 779 - 791 | - OGAWA ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMPOSIUM ON QUANTITATIVE BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 18, pages 567 - 576 | - JOHNSON; SYMINGTON, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 15, pages 4843 - 4850 | - FUGISAWA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, page 7473 | - HSIEH ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 44, page 885 | - HSIEH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 5089 | - FISHEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 3683 | - CASSUTO ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1987), vol. 208, page 10 | - GANEA ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, page 3124 | - MOORE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 19, page 11108 | - KEENE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, page 3057 | - KIMIEC, COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP., (1984), vol. 48, page 675 | - KIMEIC, CELL, (1986), vol. 44, page 545 | - KOLODNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 5560 | - SUGINO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 85, page 3683 | - HALBROOK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 21403 | - EISEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 7481 | - MCCARTHY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 5854 | - LOWENHAUPT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 20568 | - ROCA, A.I., CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM. MOLEC. BIOL., (1990), vol. 25, page 415 | - KOLODNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A.), (1987), vol. 84, page 5560 | - TISHKOFF ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., vol. 11, page 2593 | - DUNDERDALE ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, page 506 | - DYKSTRA ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, page 2583 | - CLARK ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, page 2576 | - MOORE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A.), (1991), vol. 88, page 9067 | - BISHOP ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, page 439 | - SHINOHARA ET AL., CELL, vol. 69, page 457 | - DURRENBERGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9154 - 9158 | - SKORUPSKI; TAYLOR, GENE, (1996), vol. 169, pages 47 - 52 | - HARWOOD; CUTTING, MOLECULAR BIOLOGICAL METHODS FOR BACILLUS, pages 31 - 33 | - KOWALCZYKOWSKI ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1994), vol. 58, pages 401 - 465 | - SANDLER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1996), vol. 24, pages 2125 - 2132 | - REISS, L., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 3094 - 3098 | - RAYSSIGUIER ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 396 - 401 | - VULIC ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), page 94 | - DALY; MINTON, J. BACTERIOL., (1995), vol. 177, pages 5495 - 5505 | - WAKE; ERRINGTON, ANNU. REV. GENET., (1995), vol. 29, pages 41 - 67 | - FROM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 5824 | - HOHN ET AL., Molecular Biology of Plant Tumors, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1982), pages 549 - 560 | - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73 | - HORSCH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 233, pages 496 - 498 | - FRALEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 4803 | - "Protoplasts Isolation and Culture", EVANS ET AL., Handbook of Plant Cell Cultures, MACMILLAN PUBLISHING CO., (1983), vol. 1, pages 124 - 176 | - "Recent Developments in the Culture and Regeneration of Plant Protoplasts", DAVEY, Protoplasts, BIRKHAUSER, (1983), pages 12 - 29 | - "Protoplast Culture and Plant Regeneration of Cereals and Other Recalcitrant Crops", DALE, Protoplasts, BIRKHAUSER, (1983), pages 31 - 41 | - "Regeneration of Plants", BINDING, Plant Protoplasts, CRC PRESS, (1985), pages 21 - 73 | - DESOUZA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 61, pages 3373 - 3378 | - DE SOUZA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1996), vol. 178, pages 4894 - 4900 | - GORDON ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1984), vol. 101, page 414 | - HAMMER ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, page 680 | - GANDOLFI ET AL., J. REPROD. FERT., (1987), vol. 81, pages 23 - 28 | - REXROAD ET AL., J. ANIM. SCI., (1988), vol. 66, pages 947 - 953 | - EYESTONE ET AL., J. REPROD. FERT., (1989), vol. 85, pages 715 - 720 | - CAMOUS ET AL., J. REPROD. FERT., (1984), vol. 72, pages 779 - 785 | - HEYMAN ET AL., THERIOGENOLOGY, (1987), vol. 27, page 5968 | - BRADLEY ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 309, pages 255 - 258 | - JAENISCH, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1468 - 1474 | - PIERS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 4, pages 1613 - 8 | - SHAFFNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 2163 | - REEVES ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1992), vol. 99, pages 193 - 198 | - TSONEVA, ACTA MICROBIOLOGICA BULGARIA, (1989), vol. 24, pages 53 - 59 | - BIOCHEM. J, (1997), vol. 328, pages 815 - 820 | - REDFORD ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET, (1981), vol. 184, pages 567 - 569 | - DESHAYES ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 2731 - 2737 | - KOTHE, FEMS MICROBIOL. REV., (1996), vol. 18, pages 65 - 87 | - SHARON ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET, (1996), vol. 251, pages 60 - 68 | - DALES; CROFT, J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1990), vol. 136, pages 1717 - 1724 | - GEORGOPAPADAKOU; WALSH, ANTIMICROB. AG. CHEMOTHER., (1996), vol. 40, pages 279 - 291 | - LYMAN; WALSH, DRUGS, (1992), vol. 44, pages 9 - 35 | - SELITRENNIKOFF, ANTIMICROB. AGENTS. CHEMOTHER., (1983), vol. 23, pages 757 - 765 | - BORGIA, J. BACTERIOL., (1992), vol. 174, pages 377 - 389 | - PARAVICINI ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1992), vol. 12, pages 4896 - 4905 | - SCHADE ET AL., ACTA HISTOCHEM., (1991), vol. 41, pages 193 - 200 | - METHA; GREGORY, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1981), vol. 41, pages 992 - 999 | - PAYTON; DE TIANI, CURR. GENET., (1990), vol. 17, pages 293 - 296 | - SELITRENNIKOFF, ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1983), vol. 23, pages 757 - 765 | - PHILIPOVA; VENKOV, YEAST, (1990), vol. 6, pages 205 - 212 | - TSONEVA ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1989), vol. 51, pages 61 - 65 | - CHAMBERS ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 16, pages 6110 - 6120 | - BAILIS ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 12, pages 4988 - 4993 | - MAO-DRAAYER, GENETICS, vol. 144, pages 71 - 86 | - DELCARDAYR6 ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 1 - 273 | - DELCARDAYR6; RAINES, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 6031 - 6037 | - STIERLE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 214 - 216 | - STROBEL ET AL., MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 142, pages 435 - 440 | - WILDUNG; CROTEAU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 9201 - 4 | - CONCETTI; RIPANI, BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE SEYLER, (1994), vol. 375, pages 419 - 23 | - CURRAN; CARTER, J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1983), vol. 129, pages 1589 - 1591 | - CRANDALL; BROCK, BACTERIOL. REV., (1968), vol. 32, pages 139 - 163 | - OSUMI ET AL., ARCH. MICROBIOL., (1974), vol. 97, pages 27 - 38 | - SUGISAKI ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 304, pages 464 - 466 | - MONACO; LARIN, TRENDS. BIOTECH., (1994), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 280 - 286 | - RAMSAY, MOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 181 - 201 | - HUXLEY, GENET. ENG., (1994), vol. 16, pages 65 - 91 | - JAKOBOVITS, CURR. BIOL., (1994), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 761 - 3 | - LAMB; GEARHART, CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (1995), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 342 - 8 | - MONTOLIU ET AL., REPROD. FERTIL. DEV., (1994), vol. 6, pages 577 - 84 | - MONACO; LARIN, TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 280 - 286 | - MONTOLLU ET AL., REPROD. FERTIL. DEV., (1994), vol. 6, pages 577 - 84 | - LAMB ET AL., CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (1995), vol. 5, pages 342 - 8 | - GUINEY, Bacterial Conjugation, PLENUM PRESS, (1993), pages 75 - 104 | - REIMMANN; HAAS, Bacterial Conjugation, PLENUM PRESS, (1993), pages 137 - 188 | - SALMONELLA, CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 2, pages 2377 - 2401 | - FROST ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1994), vol. 58, pages 162 - 210 | - LOW, ESCHERICHIA COLI AND SALMONELLA CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 2, pages 2402 - 2405 | - SANDERSON, ESCHERICHIA COLI AND SALMONELLA CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 2, pages 2406 - 2412 | - ACHTMAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1980), vol. 138, pages 779 - 795 | - PETERS ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1996), vol. 178, pages 3037 - 3043 | - SIMON ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1983), vol. 1, pages 784 - 791 | - TRIEUCUOT ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 102, pages 99 - 104 | - BIERMAN ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 116, pages 43 - 49 | - TRIEU-CUOT ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1993), vol. 109, pages 19 - 23 | - MASTERS, ESCHERICHIA COLI AND SALMONELLA CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 2, pages 2421 - 2442 | - STEMMER, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, page 1510 | - STEMMER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 164, pages 49 - 53 | - STEMMER, BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 549 - 553 | - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 391 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, no. L, pages 1 - 3 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 315 - 319 | - LEVICHKIN ET AL., MOL. BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 29, pages 572 - 577 | - ANDERSON; HUGHES, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 906 - 907 | - SHEN ET AL., GENETICS, (1986), vol. 112, pages 441 - 457 | - SHEN ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET, (1989), vol. 218, pages 358 - 360 | - FRIEDBERG ET AL., DNA REPAIR AND MUTAGENESIS, (1995), pages 191 - 232 | - KONRAD, J. BACTERIOL., (1977), vol. 130, pages 167 - 172 | - BYSTRYKH ET AL., J. BACT., (1996), vol. 178, pages 2238 - 2244 | - HOPWOOD, D.A., Genetic Manipulation of Streptomyces--A Laboratory Manual | WO1995US02126 | WO1997US04494 |