EP2283721 - Genetically engineered duckweed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states North Carolina State University 103 Bynum Hall Campus Box 7003 Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stomp, Anne-Marie 565 E. River Road Moncure NC 27559-9081 / US | 02 /
Rajbhandari, Nirmala 509-21 Tartan Circle Raleigh NC 27606 Raleigh, NC NC 27606 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Stomp, Anne-Marie 1221 Westview Lane Raleigh NC 27605 Raleigh, NC NC 27605 / US | ||
02 /
Rajbhandari, Nirmala 509-21 Tartan Circle Raleigh NC 27606 Raleigh, NC NC 27606 / US | Representative(s) | Ward, Siobhan HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Ward, Siobhan Harrison Goddard Foote 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2011/07] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10183914.0 | 11.08.1998 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US19970055474P | 12.08.1997 Original published format: US 55474 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2283721 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2283721 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01H4/00, C12N5/04, C12N5/14, C12N15/82, C12N15/84, C12P21/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
C12P21/00 (EP);
C12N15/8205 (EP);
C12N15/8207 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | A01H4/00, C12N5/04, C12N5/14, C12N15/82, C12N15/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/07] | Title | German: | Gentechnisch hergestellte Wasserlinse | [2011/07] | English: | Genetically engineered duckweed | [2011/07] | French: | Lentille d'eau genetiquement mise au point | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/09] | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98939350.9 / EP1037523 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980939350) is 01.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]WO9919498 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al); | by applicant | WO8704181 | EP0270356 | US4761373 | EP0359472 | US4940838 | EP0385962 | WO9116432 | JPH04222527 | EP0504869 | US5202422 | EP0604662 | US5380831 | US5436391 | EP0672752 | US5591615 | US5591616 | US5639947 | US5712135 | US5717084 | US5728925 | US5773693 | US5777200 |