EP2308295 - Apparatus for transporting an organ [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Organ Recovery Systems, Inc. 2570 E. Devon Avenue Des Plaines, IL 60018 / US | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Owen, Donald R. BIOSYN, INC. 5700 Citrus Boulevard Suite B Harahan, LA 70123 / US | 02 /
Kravitz, David C. 2570 E. Devon Avenue Des Plaines, IL 60618 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2011/15] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10183951.2 | 29.09.1999 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | US19980162128 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: US 162128 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308295 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2308295 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
A01N1/0273 (EP);
A01N1/02 (EP);
A01N1/0247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2011/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von Organen | [2011/15] | English: | Apparatus for transporting an organ | [2011/15] | French: | Appareil pour transporter d'organes | [2019/45] |
Former [2011/15] | Appareil pour transporter d'organes | Examination procedure | 25.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/36] | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06024444.9 / EP1929863 | EP99949991.6 / EP1117293 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990949991) is 01.04.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5157930 (MCGHEE SAMUEL C [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-10 * column 5, lines 38-44 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 10 * * column 8, lines 15-16 * * column 8, lines 46-59 * * column 14, line 64 - column 15, line 25; figure 3 *; | [X]US5338662 (SADRI FEREYDOON [US]) [X] 1,4,6-10 * column 7, lines 56-61 * * column 10, lines 15-35 * * column 11, lines 38-50 * * column 12, lines 61-67; figure - *; | [X]WO9629865 (ORGAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-10 * page 8, lines 15-25 * * page 12, lines 16-28 * * page 27, lines 16-23 * * claims 1,2,5-10 *; | [XPI]WO9915011 (HASSANEIN WALEED H [US]) [XP] 1-4,6-8 * page 45, line 26 - page 47, line 26; figure 11 *[I] 9,10; | [X] - PEGG D E ET AL, "The functional state of kidneys perfused at 37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-4804(73)90080-2 | Examination | US5285657 | WO9724626 | US5767804 | by applicant | US3738914 | US3892628 | US3944398 | US3995444 | US4629686 | US4745759 | US5051352 | US5066578 | US5141847 | US5149321 | US5157930 | US5217860 | US5234405 | US5285657 | US5338662 | US5395314 | US5472876 | US5476763 | US5494822 | US5584804 | US5599659 | US5709654 | US5752929 | US19950484601 | US19980039318 | US19980161919 |