EP2311410 - Stent having helical elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OrbusNeich Medical, Inc. 5363 N.W. 35th Avenue Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addonizio, Scott, J. 802 Southwest 7th Avenue Fort Lauderdale, FL 33315 / US | 02 /
Camp, David, L., Jr. 1057 Hillsboro Mile 221 Hillsboro Beach, FL 30062 / US | 03 /
Becker, Gary, J. 3368 E. Camino Boscaje Escondido Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | 04 /
Pazienza, John, D. 650 SE 5th Terrace Pompano Beach, FL 33060 / US | [2016/23] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
AddonizioO, Scott, J. 802 Southwest 7th Avenue Fort Lauderdale, FL 33315 / US | ||
02 /
Camp, David, L., Jr. 1057 Hillsboro Mile 221 Hillsboro Beach, FL 30062 / US | |||
03 /
Becker, Gary, J. 3368 E. Camino Boscaje Escondido Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | |||
04 /
Pazienza, John, D. 650 SE 5th Terrace Pompano Beach, FL 33060 / US | Representative(s) | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt LIOC Patents & Trademarks Zwaanstraat 31 L 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. Postbus 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [2011/16] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. Postbus 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | Application number, filing date | 10184477.7 | 11.12.2001 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | US20000254688P | 11.12.2000 Original published format: US 254688 P | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311410 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2311410 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/915 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP);
A61F2002/91508 (EP);
A61F2002/91516 (EP);
A61F2002/91525 (EP);
A61F2002/91533 (EP);
A61F2002/91558 (EP);
A61F2002/91583 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | A61F2/90 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Stent mit Spiralen Elementen | [2011/16] | English: | Stent having helical elements | [2011/16] | French: | Stent à éléments en hélice | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 27.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01992086.7 / EP1341482 | Divisional application(s) | EP15154813.8 / EP2926775 | EP15157256.7 Application withdrawn : 04.03.2015 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010992086) is 10.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 03.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | IT | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | GB | 11.12.2016 | LU | 11.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
GB | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0884029 (BECKER GARY J [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1020166 (ORBUS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9820810 | by applicant | US5879381 | US6117165 | US20000254688 |