EP2320343 - System and process for validating, aligning and reordering one or more genetic sequence maps using at least one ordered restriction map [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 North Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705-7365 / US | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antoniotti, Marco 298 2nd Street, Apt. 1L Jersey City, NJ 07302 / US | 02 /
Mishra, Bhubaneswar 16 Dunster Road Great Neck, NY NY 11021 / US | 03 /
Anantharaman, Thomas 208 park Avenue Apt 308 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877 / US | 04 /
Paxia, Salvatore 300 West 55th Street, Apt 16J New York, NY NY 10019 / US | 05 /
Schwartz, David c 3110 Oxford Rd Madison, WI 53705 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Antoniotti, Marco 298 2nd Street, Apt. 1L Jersey City, NJ NJ 07302 / US | ||
02 /
Mishra, Bhubaneswar 16 Dunster Road Great Neck, NY NY 11021 / US | |||
03 /
Anantharaman, Thomas 208 park Avenue Apt 308 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877 / US | |||
04 /
Paxia, Salvatore 300 West 55th Street, Apt 16J New York, NY NY 10019 / US | |||
05 /
Schwartz, David c 3110 Oxford Rd Madison, WI 53705 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Gosnall, Toby, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184566.7 | 28.09.2001 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | US20000236296P | 28.09.2000 Original published format: US 236296 P | US20010293254P | 24.05.2001 Original published format: US 293254 P | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2320343 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2320343 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/22 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP,US);
G16B30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Validierung, Ausrichtung und Neuplanung einer oder mehr genetischer Sequenzkarten mit mindestens einem Restriktionsplan | [2011/19] | English: | System and process for validating, aligning and reordering one or more genetic sequence maps using at least one ordered restriction map | [2011/19] | French: | Système et procédé pour la validation, l'alignement et la réorganisation d'une ou plusieurs cartes de séquences génétiques au moyen d'au moins une carte de restriction ordonnée | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01975549.5 / EP1328805 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010975549) is 17.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ASTON C ET AL, "Optical mapping and its potential for large-scale sequencing projects", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 17, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0167-7799(99)01326-8, ISSN 0167-7799, (19990701), pages 297 - 302, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=MImg&_imagekey=B6TCW-3WT2NNJ-9-1&_cdi=5181&_user=987766&_pii=S0167779999013268&_origin=gateway&_coverDate=07%2F01%2F1999&_sk=999829992&view=c&wchp=dGLbVlW-zSkzS&md5=8c76c07e3669d6003ea7d8179ab92e81&ie=/sdarticle.pdf, (20110517), XP004169729 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(99)01326-8 | [T] - ANTONIOTTI M ET AL, "Genomics via Optical Mapping IV: Sequence Validation via Optical Map Matching", INTERNET CITATION, (200103), URL: http://cs.nyu.edu/web/Research/TechReports/TR2000-811/TR2000-811.pdf, (20070101), XP002433390 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AP] - PLAJZER-FRICK I ET AL, "Optical mapping as a tool for sequence validation in genomic sequencing", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20000915), Database accession no. PREV200100519216, URL: BIOSIS, XP002433393 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ROUCHKA E C ET AL, "Sequence Assembly Validation by Restriction Digest Fingerprint Comparison", INTERNET CITATION, (1997), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download;jsessionid=B03983AE2247BFFFD7756CA0BCACF583?doi=10.1.1.27.647&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20070511), XP002433391 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHWARTZ D C ET AL, "ORDERED RESTRICTION MAPS OF SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE CHROMOSOMES CONSTRUCTED BY OPTICAL MAPPING", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19931001), vol. 262, no. 5130, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.8211116, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 110 - 114, XP002258437 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8211116 | by applicant | US6174671 | - E.W. MYERS ET AL., "An O(N2 lg N) Restriction Map Comparison and Search Algorithm", BULLETIN OF MATHEMATICAL BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 599 - 618, XP055489609 | - "A Uniform Framework for Ordered Restriction Map Problems", PARIDA, L., Journal of Computational Biology, MARY ANN LIEBERT INC. PUBLISHERS, (1998), vol. 5, pages 725 - 739 | - LEE, J.K.; DANCIK, V.; M.S.WATERMAN, "Estimation for restriction sites observed by optical mapping using reversible-jump Markov Chain Monte Carlo", J. COMP. BIOL., (1997), vol. 5, pages 505 - 516 | - T. ALLANTHARAMAN ET AL., "Genomics via Optical Mapping II: Ordered Restriction Maps", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 91 - 118 | - "Genomics via Optical Mapping III: Contiging Genomic DNA and Variations", T. ANANTHARAMAN ET AL., 7th International Conference on Intelligent Systems for Molecular Biology, AAAI PRESS, (1999), vol. 7, pages 18 - 27 | - J. JING ET AL., "Optical Mapping of Plasmodium Falciparum Chromosome 2", GENOME RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 9, pages 175 - 181 | - Z. LAI ET AL., "A shotgun optical map of the entire Plasmodium Fa1ciparum genome", NATURE GENETICS, (1999), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1038/15484, pages 309 - 313, XP008122563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/15484 | - M. J. GARDNER ET AL., "Chromosome 2 sequence of the human malaria parasite Plasmodium Falciparum", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, doi:doi:10.1126/science.282.5391.1126, pages 1126 - 1132, XP002907181 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.282.5391.1126 |