EP2323011 - Dynamic voltage transitions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gunther, Stephen H. 8310 SW 187th Avenue Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 02 /
Ma, Matthew M. 10941 NW Supreme Court Portland, OR 97229 / US | 03 /
Dai, Kevin 1423 Chavez Way San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 04 /
Greiner, Robert 16245 NW Gianola Court Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London, Greater London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184601.2 | 23.12.2003 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | US20020334966 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: US 334966 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2323011 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2323011 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
G06F1/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Spannungsübergänge | [2011/20] | English: | Dynamic voltage transitions | [2011/20] | French: | Transitions de tension dynamiques | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 14.12.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03258191.0 / EP1443384 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030258191) is 09.06.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2011 | 31.12.2018 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5692201 (YATO HIDENORI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000259288 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO0217064 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 15 - page 16, line 33; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO0229535 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2002087896 (CLINE LESLIE E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2002104029 (FANG WEN-CHI [TW]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2002109489 (SHAVER CHARLES N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |