Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2285066 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2285066



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
13.03.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
21.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.10.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.09.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.08.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.08.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
17.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.2011 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
19.01.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.01.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.01.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
13.12.2010 European search report Search / examination 3
02.11.2010 Amendments not yet acceptable Search / examination 1
28.10.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Description Search / examination 21
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 7
30.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
30.09.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37