|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
09.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
10.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Amendments not yet acceptable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |